Alsup v. Beckett Media LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01400 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 31, 2015 10:19 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Beckett Media LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Rodney Alsup
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Beckett Media LLC
13355 Noel Road, Suite 1990
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Alsup
P. O. Box 132274
Dallas, TX 75313 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
89 | 89
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 01/08 4:10 PM
ORDER granting88 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant, as well as any claims that Plaintiff could have asserted against Defendant, are dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs, and this order constitutes a final judgment. All relief not granted herein is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/8/2018) (ykp) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
88 | 88
1
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/04 5:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Rodney Alsup (Hill, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |