Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. v. Graham et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kristi K Dubose |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 02, 2015 6:14 AM CST |
Defendant
John Leon Graham, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leon Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spooner Petroleum Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/29 10:22 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting31 Motion to Seal Document. Doc. 28-1 has been sealed. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/29/2015. (eps) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/26 12:55 PM
Joint MOTION to Seal Inadvertently filed Confidential Document or in the Alternative to Order that the Document be Redacted or Prohibited from Public Access (Ford, Benjamin) Modified on 6/26/2015 (mcb) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 06/26 2:21 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:31 Joint MOTION to Seal Inadvertently filed Confidential Document or in the Alternative to Order that the Document be Redacted or Prohibited from Public Access to Judge Kristi K. DuBose (mcb) |
||
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Mon 06/22 2:16 PM
AGREED FINAL ORDER with attachments. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/22/2015. (mcb) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/22 2:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting28 Joint Motion to Enter Consent Order and Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/22/2015. (khc) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/22 12:37 PM
Joint Motion to Enter Consent Order and to Dismiss Case by John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust). (Wirtes, David) Modified on 6/22/2015 (mcb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
Fri 06/12 12:52 PM
Order denying Motion to Dismiss19 and Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing re:4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. Responses due by 6/19/2015 Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2015 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Kristi K. DuBose.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/12/2015. (cmj) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Mon 06/08 11:12 AM
REFERRAL OF24 Response in Opposition to Motion,25 Brief,26 Judicial Notice to Judge DuBose. (sdb) |
||
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Judicial Notice
Fri 06/05 3:30 PM
Judicial Notice by John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust) re25 Brief Reply Brief in Spooner v. Utsey (Wirtes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief
Fri 06/05 12:04 PM
Brief filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. re24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/05 12:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order - Document NOTED
Mon 06/01 11:16 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement11 filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 06/01 9:12 AM
Order Setting Motion Deadline re:19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Leon Graham, Jr., Leon Graham. Plaintiffs Response due by 6/5/2015. GRANTING21 MOTION to Suspend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Until Resolution of Defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Contesting Subject Matter Jurisdiction. They shall file their response to the motion for preliminary injunction within 7 days of the Court's ruling on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/29/15. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 06/01 9:02 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction referred to Judge DuBose. (sdb) |
||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 05/29 8:17 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 05/29 8:18 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:21 Motion to Suspend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Until Resolution of Defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Contesting Subject Matter Jurisdiction re5 to Judge DuBose (cmj) |
||
utility
Document Referred
Fri 05/29 8:19 AM
REFERRAL OF20 Brief, to Judge Cassady. (cmj) |
||
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/28 3:41 PM
MOTION Motion to Suspend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Until Resolution of Defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss Contesting Subject Matter Jurisdiction re5 Brief,4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust). (Wirtes, David) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Brief
Thu 05/28 3:34 PM
Brief filed by John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust) re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Wirtes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of John Leon Graham, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 05/28 3:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust). (Wirtes, David) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/28 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Wirtes, Jr on behalf of John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust) (Wirtes, David) |
|
17 | 17
utility
Case Transferred
Thu 05/28 11:13 AM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 05/28 12:07 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Judge DuBose (cmj) |
||
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 05/19 9:10 AM
Order re:4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc., ( Response to Motion due by 5/29/2015, Replies due by 6/5/2015.) If there is no request for reassignment filed by May 29, 2015, the undersigned will treat this as a consent case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/19/2015. (eec) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/19 9:05 AM
ORDER on11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/19/2015. (eec) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/18 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/18 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. Leon Graham served on 5/15/2015, answer due 6/5/2015 (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/18 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. John Leon Graham, Jr served on 5/15/2015, answer due 6/5/2015 (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/18 12:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing Exhibits
Fri 05/15 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Supplement) by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. re:6 Notice of Filing Exhibits,4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Bob McElroy | ||
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 05/11 11:53 AM
Order re:4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. A ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction will be HELD IN ABEYANCE until such time as all relevant documents have been served on the defendants and the defendants have had time to answer the complaint and respond to the motion. Once proof of service has been made on the record, the undersigned will enter a submission order directed to the motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/8/2015. (eec) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/11 11:41 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor William F. Blair, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, who has complied with the rules of this Court, be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in this cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/8/2015. (eec) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/07 3:41 PM
MOTION for William F. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1737276, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing; Application | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing Exhibits
Thu 05/07 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. re:6 Brief,5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Bob McElroy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A & B | ||
5 | 5
respm
Brief
Thu 05/07 2:58 PM
Brief filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc. re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 05/07 2:54 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Spooner Petroleum Company, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/07 11:31 AM
Summons Issued as to John Leon Graham, Jr, Leon Graham, Leon Graham(as Trustee for the Mary Ruth Graham Family Trust). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) |
|
Att: 1 Summons1, | ||
Att: 2 Summons2 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/07 11:09 AM
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/06 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Spooner Petroleum Company ( Receipt number 25L6OE41, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by Spooner Petroleum Company. (Ford, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Leon Graham, | ||
Att: 4 Summons - Leon Graham, As Trustee, | ||
Att: 5 Summons - John Leon Graham, Jr. |