Fierros-Mederos v. Werlick
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | James D Kirk |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01637 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/04 11:10 AM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING; Report and Recommendations2 IT IS ORDERED that the Petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 2241 be and is hereby DENIED AND DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 08/04/15. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/20 9:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr. Chief Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 7/16/2015. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/24 3:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Moises Fierros-Mederos. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED AND DISMISSED with prejudice because Petition is not in custody in violation of the Constitution or laws of the United States. Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 06/24/15. (crt,Tice, Y)(a) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 05/07 1:46 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Moises Fierros-Mederos in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 54635048102 (crt,Walker, B) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 05/06 2:03 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Moises Fierros-Mederos.(crt,Keller, J) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope |