Defense Distributed et al v. United States Department of State et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00372 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 02, 2015 8:53 AM CST |
Defendant
Directorate of Defense Trade Controls
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy Asst. Secy. Kenneth B. Handelman
|
|
Defendant
Division Chief Sarah J. Heidema
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of State John F. Kerry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director C. Edward Peartree
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Senior Advisor Glenn Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
|
|
Defendant
Kenneth B. Handelman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Defense Distributed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | 3D-printed gun lawsuit ends after 3+; years in favor of gun publisher (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Tue 07/17/2018 | |
2. | 3-D Printed Gun Lawsuit Starts the War Between Arms Control and Free Speech | WIRED (wired.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/07/2015 | |