Columbia Casualty Company v. Cottage Health System
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dean D Pregerson |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-03432 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2015 5:29 AM PST |
Defendant
Cottage Health System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Columbia Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
1. | Mediation ruled first step in cyber coverage case (businessinsurance.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/23/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/17 3:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS13 . The Court therefore DISMISSES the complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE, so that the parties may pursue alternative dispute resolution under the terms of the policy by Judge Dean D. Pregerson . (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) . (lc) Modified on 7/17/2015 (lc). |
|
21 | 21
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 07/17 2:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document18 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: objection/opposition (motion related. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 07/17/2015) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 07/16 1:59 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION TO DISMISS13 set for July 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Thu 07/16 8:43 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document,17 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 07/15 1:03 PM
Cottage Health System's Opposition to Columbia Casualty Company's Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Cottage Health System re: Motion Related Document,17 (Kornfeld, Linda) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Motion Related Document
Mon 07/13 12:16 PM
COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Walsh, Matthew) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 07/06 10:11 PM
REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 filed by Defendant Cottage Health System.(Kornfeld, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Linda D. Kornfeld | ||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/29 1:04 PM
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 Columbia's Response to Cottage's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company.(Walsh, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Columbia's Response to Cottage's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Columbia's Response to Cottage's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Columbia's Response to Cottage's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Columbia's Response to Cottage's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 06/18 11:53 PM
DECLARATION of Linda D. Kornfeld in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 13 filed by Defendant Cottage Health System. (Kornfeld, Linda) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 06/18 11:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Cottage Health System. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Kornfeld, Linda) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/18 11:39 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cottage Health System, identifying Columbia Casualty Company(plaintiff), Cottage Health System (defendant). (Attorney Linda Diane Kornfeld added to party Cottage Health System(pty:dft))(Kornfeld, Linda) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 06/04 1:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company, upon Defendant Cottage Health System served on 5/28/2015, answer due 6/18/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Linda Dominguez, Administrative Project Coordinator/Authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Walsh, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 05/19 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel areencouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/18 1:48 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Cottage Health System. (lc) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Fri 05/15 8:16 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Walsh, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/12 9:24 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 05/08 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company, identifying Continental Casualty Company, The Continental Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation, Lowes Corporation, Cottage Health System. (Walsh, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
Thu 05/07 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jp) |
|
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 05/07 4:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 05/07 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jp) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 05/07 1:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Walsh, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/07 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15677608 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Columbia Casualty Company. (Attorney Matthew T Walsh added to party Columbia Casualty Company(pty:pla))(Walsh, Matthew) |