Graham v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Paul Singh Grewal |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-02071 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2015 6:29 AM PST |
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beth Graham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 06/25 10:02 AM
FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION 5:15-CV-1685-BLF. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 06/24 6:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND SET DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT (approving 25 in Case 15-cv-01685-BLF and 19 in Case 15-cv-02071-BLF). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/24 6:13 PM
ORDER VACATING SPECIALLY SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 06/24 5:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re9 Order Relating Case,16 Order,,, Set Hearings,, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND SET DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Beth Graham. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 6/24/2015) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/17 5:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 18, 2015 TO JUNE 25, 2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 06/17 4:46 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re16 Order,,, Set Hearings,, (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 18, 2015 TO JUNE 25, 2015) filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc..(Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 6/17/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 06/15 6:04 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties in related cases Mendoza v. Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd., et al. , Case No. 15-cv-01685-BLF and Graham v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. , Case No. 15-cv-02071-BLF are ordered to appear at a Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. All parties are authorized to appear telephonically. Counsel should arrange appearances through CourtCall in advance of the hearing. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 06/15 3:50 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO COORDINATE BRIEFING SCHEDULES IN RELATED CASES filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc..(Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 6/15/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/15 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Robert Ashby (Ashby, Joseph) (Filed on 6/15/2015) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/02 10:10 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Related Case Order. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 6/2/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/01 8:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shon Morgan (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 6/1/2015) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 06/01 8:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 6/1/2015) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 06/01 8:09 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 6/1/2015) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Relating Case
Mon 06/01 4:25 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 05/20 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beth Graham re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Complaint,2 Declaration in Support,4 Proposed Summons,7 Summons Issued (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/20/2015) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/08 10:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 05/08 10:20 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2015 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 South First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/7/15. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 05/08 8:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015) |
|
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 05/07 4:16 PM
Proposed Summons. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2015) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 05/07 4:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Beth Graham re1 Complaint, CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2015) |
|
2 | 2
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Thu 05/07 4:12 PM
Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of1 Complaint, DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 1780(d) filed byBeth Graham. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2015) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/07 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Hyundai Motor America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9505011.). Filed byBeth Graham.(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2015) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |