Brown v. ForceField Energy, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02782 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2015 9:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Adrian Auman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ForceField Energy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Natan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kebir Ratnani
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard St. Julien
|
|
Defendant
David Vanderhorst
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neil J. Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/18 8:53 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Fri 03/02 2:26 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Final Settlement Approval. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 3/2/2018. (Clark, Sarah) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Fri 03/02 1:36 PM
Letter regarding Order & Final Judgment issued in In re ForceField Energy Inc. Sec. Litig., C.A. No. 1:15-cv-k03020 (SDNY) by Neil J. Brown (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/31 1:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Allyne R. Ross:Settlement Conference held on 1/30/2018. Sachs-Michaels with Brown for Plaintiff; Whalen for Defendants. Case called. (FTR Log #11:00a-11:05a.) (Williams, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Declaration
Tue 01/09 5:28 PM
DECLARATION of Ryan J. Whalen in support of Defendants' Compliance with the Court's Instructions on Notice to Shareholders by ForceField Energy, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Whalen, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Settlement
Tue 01/02 5:36 PM
MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Kai Su, Neil J. Brown. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Harwood, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Robert I. Harwood in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Fri 11/03 11:56 AM
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVING FOR NOTICE re: (31) Motion for Settlement in case 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST; (18) Motion for Settlement in case 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST. The stipulation and settlement agreement are preliminarily approved subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing on 1/30/18 at 11:00. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 11/3/2017 ) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Settlement
Fri 09/29 5:39 AM
Notice of MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Neil J. Brown. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/08 2:31 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status by Neil J. Brown Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 09/08 2:38 PM
ORDER re30 Status Report filed by Neil J. Brown. Counsel shall electronically file a motion for settlement approval by September 29th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/8/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Tue 08/08 11:39 AM
Letter re Joint Status Report by Neil J. Brown (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Tue 08/08 2:03 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER re (29 in 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST) Letter filed by Neil J. Brown. Counsel shall electronically file an updated status report by 9/8/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/8/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 07/05 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 6/30/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Sachs-Michaels with Brown for Plaintiff; Whalen for Defendants. Parties advise that they are in the process of significant settlement discussions and hope to resolve this matter along with the related case pending in the Southern District of New York without the need for further litigation. Accordingly, by August 8, 2017 the parties shall file a stipulation of settlement or a joint status report advising the Court of the status of negotiations and whether a discovery conference should be scheduled. (Tape #3:18 - 3:23.) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/19 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person status conference will be held at 3:00 p.m. on June 30, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with Defendants' counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/19/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Whalen on behalf of Adrian Auman, ForceField Energy, Inc., David Natan, Kebir Ratnani, David Vanderhorst, Jason Williams (aty to be noticed) (Whalen, Ryan) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/15 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by Adrian Auman, ForceField Energy, Inc., David Natan, Kebir Ratnani, David Vanderhorst, Jason Williams (Whalen, Ryan) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 05/01 1:21 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Counsel shall file a letter by May 15, 2017 on the status of the related case pending in the Southern District of New York. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Thu 10/27 12:18 PM
Letter re: Status Report by Kai Su, Neil J. Brown Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Sachs-Michaels, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 04/27 10:42 AM
ORDER granting (24) Motion to Stay in case 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 4/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-ST, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-ST (Bensing, Kayla) |
||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/06 11:32 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven L Tiscione. Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to the case.Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Steven L Tiscione. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stay
Wed 03/16 5:52 PM
MOTION to Stay Stipulated Temporary Stay of Proceedings Entered Into By Plaintiffs, Nominal Defendant, and all Defendants but Richard St-Julien by Neil J. Brown. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-PK, 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-PK (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Tue 01/12 11:12 AM
ORDER regarding Consolidation and Appointing Lead Counsel and related matters: granting20 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Matthew M. Houston, Robert Ira Harwood, Benjamin Isaac Sachs-Michaels as Co-Lead Counsel for plaintiffs for the conduct of the consolidated actions; granting20 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:15-cv-02782-ARR-PK; granting9 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:15-cv-04080-ARR-PK. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 1/11/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
utility
Case Consolidated
Tue 01/12 11:14 AM
Case Consolidated w 15cv4080 (Guzzi, Roseann) |
||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 10/15 10:27 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky no longer assigned to the case.Please continue to follow the individual practices of Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky, located on our[LINK:website] , where applicable until further notice.Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Peggy Kuo. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 08/19 2:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Neil J. Brown. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 08/19 2:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Neil J. Brown. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appoint Counsel Consolidate Cases
Wed 08/19 2:32 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Neil J. Brown. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Wed 08/05 3:38 PM
Courtesy Copy of Letter dated 7/27/2015 to MDL Panel from Richard Gonnello, Esq. regarding withdrawal of opposition to Motion to Brewer's Motion to Transfer and Coordinate. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Thu 07/16 11:18 PM
Letter in Response to Represented Defendants' Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Neil J. Brown (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Mon 07/13 11:20 AM
Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 07/07 5:17 PM
Letter re Premotion Conference by Adrian Auman, ForceField Energy, Inc., David Natan, Kebir Ratnani, David Vanderhorst, Jason Williams (Russo, Martin) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 07/02 10:54 AM
ORDER The court's order dated July 1, 2015, setting a briefing schedule for defendants' motion to dismiss, is vacated. The court directs defendants to file a pre-motion letter by July 7, 2015, outlining the relevant facts and legal authorities as to each proposed basis for dismissal listed in defendants' June 30, 2015 letter (failure to state a claim, venue, personal jurisdiction, etc.). In accordance with Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, plaintiffs will file a responsive letter by July 16, 2015. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/2/2015. (Gil-Montllor, Peter) |
||
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 07/01 4:39 PM
NOTICE from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel In Re: Forcefield Energy Inc. Securities and Derivative Litigation. Schedule of actions. Motion to transfer and coordinate or consolidate actions for pretrial proceedings. (Exhibits 1-11 copies of complaints of SDNY cases will not be scanned) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/01 11:22 AM
ORDER The court has reviewed the parties' pre-motion letters concerning the defendants' proposed motion to dismiss and grants permission to bring the motion. The court directs that defendants' motion shall be briefed as follows: defendants' motion and supporting papers shall be served no later than July 7, 2015; plaintiff's opposition papers shall be served no later than July 22, 2015; defendants' reply papers, if any, shall be served no later than July 28, 2015. The fully-briefed motion shall be filed in accordance with chambers' rules, including courtesy copies for chambers, no later than July 28, 2015. This schedule may be altered only with the permission of the court. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 7/1/2015. (Gil-Montllor, Peter) |
||
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 06/30 3:02 PM
Letter re Pre-motion Conference and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Neil J. Brown (Brown, Timothy) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Tue 06/30 2:42 PM
Letter re: Premotion Conference and Proposed Briefing Schedule by Adrian Auman, ForceField Energy, Inc., David Natan, Kebir Ratnani, David Vanderhorst, Jason Williams (Russo, Martin) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/30 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin P. Russo on behalf of Adrian Auman, ForceField Energy, Inc., David Natan, Kebir Ratnani, David Vanderhorst, Jason Williams (aty to be noticed) (Russo, Martin) |
|
Tuesday, May 19, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 2:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. Richard St. Julien served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 2:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. Kebir Ratnani served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 2:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. Jason Williams served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 2:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. ForceField Energy, Inc. served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 2:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. David Vanderhorst served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 1:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. David Natan served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/19 1:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil J. Brown. Adrian Auman served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/15 1:54 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 05/15 1:44 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 05/15 1:44 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 05/15 1:43 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 05/14 2:46 PM
NOTICE : Plaintiff attorney Mr. Brown has been contacted on 5/14/2015 via email in regards to the 2nd page of the coversheet. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/13 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7740346 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Neil J. Brown. (Brown, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Adrian Auman, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons ForceField Energy, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons David Natan, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Kbir Ratnani, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Richard St-Julien, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons David Vanderhorst, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Jason Williams |