99 Cents Only Stores LLC v. Fortune International Properties LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00864 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 09, 2015 5:42 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Fortune International Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
99 Cents Only Stores LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fortune International Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
99 Cents Only Stores LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 06/24 4:24 PM
ORDER pursuant to the parties'37 Stipulation. ORDERED dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs except as otherwise expressly provided in the settlement agreement between the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/24/2016. (LFIG) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/24 3:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(McClure, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 05/09 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/03 11:41 AM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Tue 05/03 11:40 AM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171436 as to Brett L McClure. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/03 11:40 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brett L McClure on behalf of 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (BAS) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 04/22 10:25 AM
ORDER granting the joint motion (Doc.31 ) and amending the deadlines as follows: Discovery due by 6/30/2016; Dispositive motions due by 11/16/2016 (see document for further details). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming the remainder of the original Rule 16 Scheduling Order (Doc.18 ). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/22/16. (KGM) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Deposition
Thu 04/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Fortune International Properties LLC, filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 04/21 3:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Scheduling Order, Terminate Hearings Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 03/03 2:39 PM
ORDER granting the29 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/28/2016. Dispositive motions due by 9/16/2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/3/2016. (See Order for details.)(LFIG) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 03/03 12:52 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct28 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines (Third Request) by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 01/27 4:50 PM
ORDER granting the27 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/29/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/27/2016. (See Order for details.)(LFIG) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 01/27 12:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct26 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,25 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Scheduling Order, Terminate Hearings Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines ,18 Scheduling Order, Terminate Hearings (Second Request) by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 12/29 10:52 AM
ORDER granting the25 Joint Motion to Amend the18 Rule 16 Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/29/2016. Dispositive motions due by 7/18/2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/29/2015. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 12/28 3:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Scheduling Order, Terminate Hearings Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Certain Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend | ||
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report - Other
Mon 12/07 4:18 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks (Joint Report) by Counter Claimant Fortune International Properties LLC. (Hatch, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 10/21 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 10/05 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 09/30 6:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Fortune International Properties LLC. (Hatch, Brian) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 09/30 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
Thu 09/17 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Andrew Stuart Pauly. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 09/10 3:11 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/29/2016. Dispositive motions due by 6/17/2016. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for September 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/10/2015. (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Wed 09/09 12:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/13 8:06 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 9/16/2015 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/10/2015. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 07/09 3:24 PM
ANSWER to14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC.(Pauly, Andrew) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 06/19 11:13 AM
First Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM First Amended Counterclaim against 99 Cents Only Stores LLC by Fortune International Properties LLC.(Hatch, Brian) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/04 6:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fortune International Properties LLC. (Hatch, Brian) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 06/04 6:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 99 Cents Only Stores LLC by Fortune International Properties LLC.(Hatch, Brian) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/28 3:33 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/28 3:32 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew S Pauly on behalf of 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (BAS) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/28 3:30 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Damon A Thayer on behalf of 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (BAS) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Thu 05/28 3:31 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX159050 as to Damon A Thayer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Thu 05/28 3:32 PM
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX159049 as to Andrew S Pauly. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Wed 05/20 10:38 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Coporate Disclosure Statement upon Malik Kanjiyani, Statuory Agent on 5/14/2015. (Kelly, John) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/15 11:12 AM
NOTICE re: of Service of Court Order by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC re:6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Kelly, John) |
|
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Thu 05/14 4:42 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/14/2015. (LFIG) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/14 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Fortune International Properties LLC. (ACL) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/14 10:24 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC identifying Corporate Parent Number Holdings Incorporated, Other Affiliate; Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III LP, Other Affiliate; CPP Investment Board (USRE II) Incorporated for 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (ACL) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 05/14 10:19 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11676550. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-864-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ACL) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 05/14 10:17 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (submitted by John DeWulf) (ACL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/14 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11676550 filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC. (submitted by John DeWulf)(ACL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |