Richard Vos et al v. City of Newport Beach et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-00768 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jul 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 11, 2015 6:05 AM PST |
Defendant
City of Newport Beach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nathan Farris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Henry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dave Kresge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Jenelle Bernacchi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Vos
|
Represented By
|
1. | Supreme Court clears the way for lawsuit over Newport Beach police shooting (latimes.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/21/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
190 | 190
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 04/07 9:07 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE189 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 120 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
189 | 189
notice
Settlement
Tue 04/06 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Pending) filed by Defendants City of Newport Beach, Nathan Farris, Richard Henry. (Ferguson, Peter) |
|
188 | 188
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Tue 04/06 11:21 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendants City of Newport Beach, Nathan Farris, Richard Henry: Mediation held on March 31, 2021 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Ferguson, Peter) |