shierkatz RLLP v. Square, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-02202 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 11, 2015 5:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Square, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
shierkatz RLLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
111 | 111
1
pgs
order
Judgment Terminate Civil Case
Wed 10/17 9:43 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
|
110 | 110
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/17 9:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SQUARE, INC.'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARDS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 107 Motion Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award. (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
109 | 109
2
pgs
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 10/15 12:09 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Statement of Non-Opposition to Confirmation of Arbitral Award filed byshierkatz RLLP.(McGrane, William) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
108 | 108
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 10/15 10:06 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Square, Inc.. Amendment to107 MOTION Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award [Amended Proposed] Judgment . (Baskin, Joshua) |