France v. SSA (Court Use Only)
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph M Hood |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Mon 06/06 10:02 AM
JUDGMENT: (1) the administrative decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED & judgment entered in favor of Commissioner; (2) this is a final & appealable judgment; (3) action is DISMISSED & STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/3/16.(KJR) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 06/06 9:59 AM
ORDER: (1) DENYING pla's9 Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) GRANTING dft's12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/3/16. (KJR) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 10/28 8:15 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of SSA with supporting memorandum (Osborn, John) |
|
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 10/28 10:35 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of SSA with supporting memorandum ,9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cathy Lynn France (CBD) |
||
misc
Clerk's Note
Wed 10/28 3:50 PM
Clerk's Note: re7 Answer to Complaint: copy of Administrative Transcript received by the clerk's office & forwarded to chambers. (KJR) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Wed 10/28 4:10 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of SSA with supporting memorandum ,9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cathy Lynn France (KJR) |
||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Social Security Scheduling Order Deadline Terminate Motions Terminate Deadlines
Mon 10/19 2:51 PM
ORDER: (1) that Defendant's Motion (DE10 ) is hereby GRANTED; (2) that Defendant has ten (10) additional days to FILE her Motion for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/19/2015.(CBD) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/19 10:38 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of SSA TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM(Osborn, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 09/18 11:16 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cathy Lynn France(Arnett, William) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Social Security Notice and Standing Briefing Schedule
Thu 07/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: (1) Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; (2) Commissioner file counter-motion or response w/in 30 days; (3) Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as otherwise provided in this order. (4) Extensions of time, expansions of page limitations, or permission to file additional briefs may be granted only if good cause is shown. (5) Nothing in this Order shall preclude presiding judge from hearing oral argument. (6) Effective immediately, Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in all social security actions upon filing of answer and administrative transcript. (7) This General Order supersedes General Order 09-13 filed on November 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/24/2013.(RCB) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/22 10:09 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Commissioner of SSA.(Osborn, John) |
|
Att: 1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security | ||
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 06/18 4:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal Service (USM) via Certified U.S. Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 6/1/2015. Service to U.S. Attorney executed by USM via Certified U.S. Mail on 5/29/2015; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed by USM via Certified U.S. Mail on 6/4/2015. (MWZ) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/03 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Osborn, III on behalf of Commissioner of SSA (Osborn, John) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 05/26 2:34 PM
Summons issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (AWD) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 05/22 3:47 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: (1) Pla's1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (2) Pla may proceed without payment of costs/fees. (3) Clerk directed to file Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on May 22, 2015. (AWD) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/21 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Cathy Lynn France. (RKT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Denial, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - ALJ Unfavorable Decision, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Tendered Summons SSA, | ||
Att: 5 Tendered Summons US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 6 Tendered Summons US Attorney, | ||
Att: 7 USM 285 Form, | ||
Att: 8 Case Assignment | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/21 1:05 PM
MOTION Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs by Cathy Lynn France.(RKT) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Thu 05/21 1:10 PM
Conflict Check run. (RKT) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 05/21 1:12 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Joseph M. Hood for review: re1 MOTION Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs by Cathy Lynn France. (RKT) |