DataMotion Texas, LLC v. Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00893 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 24, 2015 7:37 AM CST |
Defendant
Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DataMotion Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC
Terminated: 07/09/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente Inc.
Terminated: 07/28/2015
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Thu 03/03 10:07 AM
Interdistrict transfer to the California Northern District. (ch, ) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 03/03 10:08 AM
Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:16-cv-01028, filed 03/01/2016. (ch, ) |
||
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/03 9:13 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue. ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. The Clerk is directed to take such steps as are necessary to effect this transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/2016. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
8
pgs
respm
Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 10/16 8:48 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re22 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404 filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC . (Schlather, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 10/06 4:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404 filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc. .(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua Roth | ||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 09/25 10:32 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:25 Response in Opposition to Motion,..(Schlather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 5 - HSBC '248 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 6 - HSBC '967 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 7 - John Hancock '967 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 8 - Kaiser '248 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 9 - Kaiser '967 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 10 - Distance, Fordham to Marshall, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 11 - Distance, Fordham to SF, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 13 - Distance, NY to Marshall, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 14 - Distance, NY to SF, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 15 - Assignment Search for '248 patent, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 16 - Assignment Search for '967 patent, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 17 - EDTX and NDCA caseload stats, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 18 - US 6,684,248, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 19 - US 8,447,967 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/25 10:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404 filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC .(Schlather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Bob Janacek, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Mahesh Muchhala, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Stephen F. Schlather, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - HP '248 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - HP '967 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - ADP '248 PIC Chart, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 - ADP '967 PIC Chart | ||
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/24 8:28 AM
ORDER granting23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/23/2015. (ch, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/22 4:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404 by DataMotion Texas, LLC.(Schlather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 09/04 5:11 PM
Opposed MOTION to Transfer Venue Under to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404 by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of David McWaters, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Ravi Ravipati, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Victoria Zatkin, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Roozbeh Gorgin, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F | ||
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Mon 08/31 11:20 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. Cause No. 2:15-cv-894 is designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial.The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/27/15. (mll, ) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 08/31 11:27 AM
This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 2:15cv894 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, ) |
||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 08/28 9:43 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/28 9:22 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 08/28 9:18 AM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/10 11:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC.(Edmonds, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 07/28 9:51 AM
ORDER granting14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice Kaiser Permanente Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/28/15. (ch, ) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 07/27 3:39 PM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc..( Auyang, Heather) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Mon 07/27 3:47 PM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc. to 8/29/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/24 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DataMotion Texas, LLC(Edmonds, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Kaiser Permanent Inc | ||
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/22 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DataMotion Texas, LLC. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc. served on 7/9/2015, answer due 7/30/2015. (mrm, ) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 07/09 10:22 AM
ORDER granting10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kaiser Permanente Ventures. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/6. (ch, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/08 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Inc.,(ch, ) |
|
Att: 1 Kaiser Permanente Inc | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/07 8:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DataMotion Texas, LLC(Edmonds, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC without prejudice | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/07 8:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC.(Edmonds, John) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/26 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DataMotion Texas, LLC. Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC served on 6/10/2015. (ch, ) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Fri 06/12 1:31 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC.( Auyang, Heather) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Fri 06/12 1:36 PM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC to 7/31/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/02 4:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DataMotion, Inc. for DataMotion Texas, LLC. (Edmonds, John) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 06/01 3:26 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Edmonds, John) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/01 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shea Neal Palavan on behalf of DataMotion Texas, LLC (Palavan, Shea) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/01 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen F Schlather on behalf of DataMotion Texas, LLC (Schlather, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/01 11:54 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC. (ch, ) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/28 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Kaiser Permanente Ventures, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5219811.), filed by DataMotion Texas, LLC.(Edmonds, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - '248 Patent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/28 6:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Thu 05/28 6:24 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |