Washington v. American Commercial Lines, L.L.C. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ivan Lr Lemelle |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01814 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 00:0000 Cause Code Unknown |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 25, 2015 8:46 AM CST |
Defendant
American Commercial Lines, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Commercial Lines, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Washington
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 16 2016
ORDER AND REASONS denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg) |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/06 1:01 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle.(ijg) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 07/06 11:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 7/5/2016. As a result of ongoing negotiations among the Court and the parties, a settlement agreement was reached in the above-captioned matter. (NEF: Judge Lemelle's Chambers) (bwn) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Wed 06/22 2:38 PM
ORDER: Considering the impeachment evidence submitted to the Court by ACL, for in camera review, Ordered that defendant shall immediately produce and disclose the evidence to plaintiff. Further Ordered that plaintiff shall be given the opportunity to depose the individual who conducted the surveillance. Any such deposition must be completed by 7/1/2016. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/21/2016.(ijg) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Fri 06/17 8:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/16/2016. Trial Preparation Order. Jury trial set 7/18/2016 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 06/16 1:18 PM
ORDER AND REASONS denying14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Mon 06/13 4:18 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by American Commercial Lines LLC, Walmart Transportation, LLC, and Gary Washington (Misko, Megan) Added filers on 6/13/2016 (ijg) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 06/08 9:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 6/7/2016. Negotiations were productive but unfortunately no resolution of Plaintiffs claims could be achieved at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (bwn) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 06/01 2:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C. re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (ijg) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 06/01 2:58 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 05/24 9:01 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re21 Reply to Response to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event. (ijg) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 05/23 5:03 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C. re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Mason, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading | ||
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/20 1:31 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by American Commercial Lines, LLC re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Rice, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/20 1:00 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Gary Washington re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Misko, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts | ||
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Set Hearings
Mon 05/16 12:49 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North.(bwn) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 05/13 11:42 AM
ORDER Granting15 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on WalMart Transportation, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment . WalMart's14 MOTION for Summary Judgment is set for submission on 5/25/2016. Further Ordered that any opposition shall be filed by 4:30 p.m. on 5/20/2016. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle.(ijg) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/12 6:09 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by American Commercial Lines, LLC re15 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on WalMart Transportation, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing . (Rice, Kathleen) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Expedite Hearing
Thu 05/12 4:02 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on WalMart Transportation, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Hearing by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C..(Mason, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 05/11 5:37 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/8/2016.(Mason, W.) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Notice of Submission | ||
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Wed 04/20 10:25 AM
Amended Witness and Exhibit List by Gary Washington. (Misko, Megan) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 04/18 4:52 PM
Exhibit List by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.. (Mason, W.) |
|
11 | 11
trial
Witness List
Mon 04/18 4:51 PM
Witness List by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.. (Mason, W.) |
|
10 | 10
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Mon 04/18 3:00 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Gary Washington. (Misko, Megan) |
|
9 | 9
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Mon 04/18 1:46 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by American Commercial Lines, LLC. (Rice, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/17 12:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2016 08:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 5/17/2016. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle.(ijg) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Set Hearings
Fri 08/28 11:16 AM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2015 11:15 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ijg) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/22 11:05 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C..Attorney W. Brett Mason added to party Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Mason, W.) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Transferring Case
Tue 07/07 1:57 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/7/2015.(my)(NEF:ILRL, MBN) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/01 9:30 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by American Commercial Lines, LLC.Attorney Kathleen Pontier Rice added to party American Commercial Lines, LLC(pty:dft).(Rice, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/01 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to American Commercial Lines, L.L.C., Wal-Mart Transportation, L.L.C.(ijg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/29 3:50 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (mmv) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/29 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against American Commercial Lines, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4877533) filed by Gary Washington.Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Gary Washington(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Financial Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |