Herminia Harper et al v. Fresenius USA, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04107 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 28, 2015 4:46 AM PST |
Defendant
Walter L. Weisman
|
|
Defendant
Ben Lipps
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Fresenius USA Sales, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ora Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Cornwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Argean Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael McGhee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelia McLean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tex Miley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Pfleging
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frances Plaza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Plouffe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred Shroulote
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thorn Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Teel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Corn Well
|
|
Plaintiff
Joyce Wilder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delores Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mirna Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Ball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Boyiddle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dolores Brown
|
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvin Bullock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Busby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Calip
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Cloud
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terri Crocker-Burden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Delisle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Linley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Digilio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gillon Gay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herminia Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Hertz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Hill-Beene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Kaufman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Kight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beneatha Lake
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esta Akers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 06/26 9:08 AM
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Central: case has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:15-cv-12817. (rn) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 06/26 8:41 AM
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Central: case has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:15-cv-12817. (rn) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Transferring Case
Wed 06/24 10:36 AM
TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2428, transferring case to USDC District of Massachusetts at Boston and assigned to the Honorable Douglas P. Woodlock on 6/23/2015. Case electronically transferred. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco) |
|
Att: 1 CV57 | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/16 3:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Court orders the party who filed the case-initiating documents in this action to deliver mandatory chambers copies to Judge Bernal's courtesy box located outside of Courtroom 1, 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, CA 92501 within 3 days of this order. See Local Rule 5-4.5; General Order No. 14.01(IV)(E). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ima) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/09 1:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. Effective July 8, 2013, all proposed sealed documents pertaining to discovery matters referred to the magistrate judge must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address at AGR_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mp) |
|
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/09 10:56 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/09 10:54 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal.(ima) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Fri 06/05 12:20 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: EDCV13-00401 JGB (OPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV15-04107 JGB (AGRx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (mg) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 06/02 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, re Notice of Related Case(s),4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Notice (Other),5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 served on June 2, 2015. (Stern, David) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 06/02 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 served on June 2, 2015. (Stern, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 06/02 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/01 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 06/01 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/01 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, (Stern, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 06/01 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps. (Stern, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/01 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC555862 Receipt No: 0973-15819340 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Fresenius USA, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America, Ben Lipps. (Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Fresenius Medical Care North America(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Fresenius USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H Stern added to party Ben Lipps(pty:dft))(Stern, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David Stern in Support of Fresenius Defendants' and Ben Lipps' Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David Stern, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David Stern, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David Stern, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D-E to Declaration of David Stern, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of David Stern | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 06/02 10:56 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT (BC555862) against defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps, Walter L. Weisman, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Joyce Wilder, James Thomas, Alvin Bullock, Janice Jones, Richard Kaufman, Mirna Diaz, Herminia Harper, Cynthia Ball, Amy Cornwell, Judy Kight, Judy Edwards, Robin Hertz, Robert Calip, Linda Digilio, Samuel Brown, Yvonne Busby, Jacquelyn Cloud, Shelia McLean, Kenneth Linley, Sandra Morris, Ora Lewis, Gillon Gay, Arthur Plouffe, Argean Matthews, Donna Delisle, Frances Plaza, John Pfleging, Thorn Spencer, Delores Brown, Ronnie Green, Terri Crocker-Burden, Brenda Boyiddle, Karen Hill-Beene, Julie Chavez, Esta Akers, Beneatha Lake, Alfred Shroulote, Tex Miley, Russell Teel, Michael McGhee. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 06/02 11:01 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc., Fresenius Medical Care North America, Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Fresenius USA Marketing, Inc., Fresenius USA Sales, Inc., Fresenius USA, Inc., Ben Lipps.(esa) |