Pokemon Company Intenational, Inc. v. Sahagian
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Zilly |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00866 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 28, 2015 3:41 AM PST |
Defendant
Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant
Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
Doe 2
|
|
Defendant
Doe 3
|
|
Defendant
Doe 4
|
|
Defendant
Doe 5
|
|
Plaintiff
The Pokemon Company Intenational, Inc.
333 108th Ave. NE Suite 1900
Bellevue, WA 98004 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pokemon Company International Inc
333 108th Ave. NE Suite 1900
Bellevue, WA 98004 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jon Sahagian
Terminated: 09/08/2015
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Wed 05/11 10:44 AM
Copy of Copyright form, Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Jon Sahagian, and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice mailed to the Copyright Office in Washington D.C. (CDA) |
||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 11/30 10:13 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (AD) |
||
Sunday, November 29, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Sun 11/29 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Doe 3, Doe 4, Doe 5, Doe 1 and Doe 2, filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. (McChesney, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Tue 09/08 4:46 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT JON SAHAGIAN; judgment is entered in favor of TPCi and against Jon Sahagian; Court shall retain jurisdiction of this action for purposes of construing, modifying, and enforcing this Permanent Injunction by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) |
|
15 | 15
order
2 - Minute Order
Tue 09/08 4:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Plaintiff The Pokmon Company International, Inc. and defendant Jon Sahagian have submitted a stipulation for final judgment and a proposed order for a permanent injunction against defendant Sahagian. The Court finds there is no just reason to delay and will therefore ENTER the proposed judgment and order for permanent injunction. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report with the Court by November 30, 2015, as to whether plaintiff is pursuing its case against Does 1-5 or whether this case can be dismissed as to remaining defendants.(PM) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/03 3:53 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Entry of Final Judgment & Permanent Injunction Against Jon Sahagian by parties(McChesney, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Final Judgment & Permanent Injunction | ||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion
Fri 08/28 4:50 PM
NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. (McChesney, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 08/04 4:42 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. Noting Date 8/28/2015, (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/30 11:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jon Sahagian on 6/7/2015, filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 07/30 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction3 is STRICKEN. (KD) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/27 12:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is extended to 8/28/2015. The Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/11/2015. The Joint Status Report is due by 9/11/2015. (KD) |
||
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 06/12 2:47 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/28/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/11/2015, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion Re-Noted
Fri 06/05 10:01 AM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. Noting Date 7/10/2015, (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/02 4:51 PM
DECLARATION of Sean McChesney filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction(Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
6 | 6
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/02 4:48 PM
DECLARATION of Kimberly Warren filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction(Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
5 | 5
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/02 4:46 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew Finch filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/02 4:45 PM
DECLARATION of David Schwimmer filed by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 06/02 4:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Pokemon Company International Inc. Noting Date 6/26/2015, (Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/02 12:09 PM
Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Jon Sahagian. (ST) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/02 12:07 PM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Tue 06/02 12:12 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights via U.S. Postal Service. (ST) |
||
utility
Notice to Filer
Tue 06/02 12:23 PM
NOTICE to Filer: When opening a case in the future, please add all attorney(s) listed on the complaint. In addition, Doe parties should be added to the case as separate defendants. Thank you. (ST) |
||
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/01 8:11 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jon Sahagian, Does 1-5 Attorney Venkat Balasubramani added to party The Pokemon Company Intenational, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by The Pokemon Company Intenational, Inc..(Balasubramani, Venkat) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form121), | ||
Att: 4 Summons |