Collateral International, LLC v. Dennler
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis T Babcock |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01168 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 09:0207 - Application for Order Confirming Award of Arbitrators |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jun 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 01, 2015 6:40 AM MST |
Defendant
Cheryl L Dennler
|
|
Plaintiff
Collateral International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Judgment
Tue 05/24 2:58 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Cheryl L. Dennler and against Collateral International, LLC pursuant to34 Order, by Clerk on 5/24/2016. (ebuch) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/24 2:35 PM
ORDER regarding27 Report and Recommendation. This action is dismissed without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/24/2016. (ebuch) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/17 11:43 AM
OBJECTION to27 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC. (ebuch) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Miguel Alvarez | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
Tue 05/17 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting31 Plaintiff's Motion to File Corrected Version of Plaintiff's Objection to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/17/2016. (ebuch) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Amend/Correct/Modify
Mon 05/16 4:20 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify30 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Document Corrected Objection - Redlined, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Document Corrected Objection - Clean, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Miguel Alvarez, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Correct Objection | ||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/13 3:57 PM
OBJECTION to27 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Documents Regarding Criminal Eviction, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Investigation Report Regarding Defendant, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope Exhibit D - Property Tax Records, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Equifax Report, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Affidavit of M. Alverez | ||
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 05/12 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting28 Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Extension of Time to File Objection to the Recommendation, up to and including 5/13/2016, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/12/2016. (ebuch) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 05/11 5:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Objection to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Bellanti, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 04/27 10:37 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/27/16. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the actionbe DISMISSED without prejudice. (nmarb, ) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 04/15 5:11 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re25 by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Bellanti, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Defendants Property Information, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Co-Signer Property Information, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Credit Agreement | ||
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 03/25 1:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/25/16. Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, in writing and on or before April 15, 2016, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1 for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the January 4, 2016 Order; Plaintiff shall also show cause, if any there be, in writing and on or before April 15, 2016, as to the basis for diversity jurisdiction in this action; and Plaintiff is specifically ADVISED that failure to adequately address the issues presented in this Order to Show Cause will result in a Recommendation that the lawsuit be dismissed. (bsimm, ) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 03/25 12:02 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 3/25/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. No parties appear for the hearing. The Court will issue an Order to Show Cause. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/02 1:37 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC. (Bellanti, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Mon 01/04 2:55 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/4/16. The Order to Show Cause20 dated December 15, 2015 is DISCHARGED; Plaintiff shall file proof of service on or before February 29, 2016; and A Status Conference is set for 3/25/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, ) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 12/28 6:19 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Status Report Regarding Service re20 by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC. (Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/15 2:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/15/15. Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, in writing and on or before December 29,2015, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.1 for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the August 13, 2015 Order12 . (bsimm, ) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/11 10:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/11/2015. (ebuch) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/04 4:30 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 11/3/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discussion held regarding status of case related to Pilot Project Consent. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, ) |
|
17 | 17
order
Minute Order
Tue 11/03 5:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Collateral International, LLC. The Status Conference set for 12/18/15 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/3/15. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Tue 11/03 4:11 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Consent not achieved. This case is reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 15-cv-01168-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/03 1:49 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC Consent not achieved by parties.. (Lengen, Alexandra) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 11/02 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra Marie Lengen on behalf of Collateral International, LLCAttorney Alexandra Marie Lengen added to party Collateral International, LLC(pty:pla) (Lengen, Alexandra) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order
Thu 10/29 8:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference regarding the Pilot Program Consent Form. The Status Conference is set for 11/3/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Counsel shall contact Chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Upon filing of the consent form, the Telephonic Status Conference will be vacated without further action by the Parties. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/29/15. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 08/13 2:06 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff shall file proof of service with the court on or before 12/14/15; a Status Conference is set for 12/18/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/13/15. (nywlc1) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Wed 08/12 12:46 PM
MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extension of Time for Service by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 08/04 3:31 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/4/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/1/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. The parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form on or before 8/25/2015. (bsimm, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Order
Wed 06/24 9:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Order To Appoint Special Process Server, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/23/15.(nmarb, ) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Order
Mon 06/22 10:17 AM
MOTION for Order to Appoint Special Process Server by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Summons Issued
Tue 06/16 2:19 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. (agarc, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Tue 06/16 11:20 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/15/15 granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case4 . Text Only Entry(bsimm, ) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Fri 06/12 2:15 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 06/08 3:34 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case | ||
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/05 6:08 PM
COMPLAINT and Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award against Cheryl L Dennler (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4446954)Attorney Ronald Bret Beattie added to party Collateral International, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Collateral International, LLC.(Beattie, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
2 | 2
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Fri 06/05 4:06 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the administrative notice filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (amenz, ) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Administrative Notice
Thu 06/04 4:09 PM
Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, ) |