Kendrick v. Northstar Location Services, LLC
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Sue L Robinson |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00473 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 07, 2015 9:54 AM EST |
Defendant
Northstar Location Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kendall Kendrick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/08 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kendall Kendrick (Becker, Doreen) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Wed 12/09 3:50 PM
CASE CLOSED per D.I.4 . (fms) |
||
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 11/05 11:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/5/2015. (nmfn) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
service
Summons Reissued - Alias Summons
Thu 08/06 3:31 PM
Alias Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Northstar Location Services, LLC. (aah) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 08/06 3:33 PM
Remark: Alias summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel at Upright Law LLC 79 West Monroe Street, 5th floor, Chicago, IL. 60603 per request.(aah) |
||
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 07/10 3:21 PM
Remark : Alias summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel at Upright Law LLC 79 West Monroe Street, 5th floor, Chicago, IL. 60603 per request. (etg, ) |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
service
Summons Reissued - Alias Summons
Mon 07/06 4:01 PM
Alias Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Northstar Location Services, LLC. (aah) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/17 12:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Wed 06/10 1:21 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/10 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Northstar Location Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1736854.) - filed by Kendall Kendrick.(sar) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/10 1:22 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Northstar Location Services, LLC on 6/10/2015. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar) |
||
utility
Remark
Wed 06/10 1:48 PM
Remark : Summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel at Upright Law LLC 79 West Monroe Street, 5th floor, Chicago, IL. 60603 per plaintiff's request. (klc) |