Ellerton et al v. Sefton Resources Inc., et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01212 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 07, 2015 7:56 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Sefton Resources Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
C&J Resources Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
C&J Resources Pension Plan and Trust
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John J. Ellerton
2724 Puuhoolai Street
Kihei Maui, HI 96753 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sefton Resources Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas G. Milne
|
|
Defendant
Thomas (I) G. Milne
|
|
Defendant
Keith A. Morris
|
|
Defendant
Keith (I) A. Morris
|
|
Defendant
Mark R. Smith
|
|
Defendant
Mark (I) R. Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
C&J Resources Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C&J Resources Pension Plan and Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John J. Ellerton
2724 Puuhoolai Street
Kihei Maui, HI 96753 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
133 | 133
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 07/06 5:09 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part115 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is AWARDED $6,684.50 in attorneys fees, to be borne by Plaintiffs John J. Ellerton, C & J Resources, Inc, and C & J Resources Pension Plan &Trust, jointly and severally. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/6/2017. (nywlc1) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
132 | 132
misc
Costs Taxed
Thu 06/29 2:37 PM
Costs Taxed by the Clerk in the amount of $47,672.63 against Plaintiff John J. Ellerton and in favor of Defendant Sefton Resources, Inc. (ebutl) |