Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John R Padova
Case #: 2:15-cv-03333
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2015
Defendant
ANDREW DANCHA
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER OPPMAN
Defendant
CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS (CCS)
Defendant
JAMES FROMMER
Defendant
JAY COWAN
Defendant
JOHN HOCHBERG
Defendant
JOHN KEPHART
Defendant
JOHN WETZEL
Defendant
JOSEPH C. KORSZNIAK
Defendant
KEPHART
Defendant
NICHOLAS SCHARFF
Defendant
PAUL NOEL
Defendant
PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT CORRECTIONS (DOC)
Defendant
RICH WENHOLD
Defendant
THOMAS LEHMAN
Defendant
WEINER
Defendant
WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Defendant
WILLIAM DREIBELBIS
Notice Only Party
BARRY JONES
Notice Only Party
BIENVENIDO RODRIGUEZ, JR.
Notice Only Party
CHRISTOPHER SINGLETARY
Notice Only Party
GABRIEL PITTMAN
Notice Only Party
HERMAN WILKES
Notice Only Party
JAMES BROWN
Notice Only Party
WILLIAMS HAY
Plaintiff
DANIEL LEYVA
Plaintiff
DAVID MALDONADO
Plaintiff
SALVATORE CHIMENTI

GPO Mar 21 2016
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/21/16. 3/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
GPO Mar 21 2016
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE DOC DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 11 AND THE MOTION TO DISMISS AND SEVER 14, IT IS ORDERED THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION TO DISMISS AND SEVER IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/21/16. 3/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
GPO Aug 08 2017
MEMORANDUM. AN APPROPRIATE ORDER FOLLOWS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/7/17. 8/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
GPO Aug 08 2017
ORDER THAT THE DOC DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 56) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS TO ALL CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST THE PA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND RICH WENHOLD, AND THOSE DEFTS. ARE DISMISSED AS DEFTS. IN THIS ACTION. THE MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY THE MEDICAL DEFTS. (DOC. NO. 63) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/7/17. 8/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
GPO May 24 2018
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/24/18. 5/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
GPO May 24 2018
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND ALL DOCUMENTS FILED IN CONNECTION THEREWITH, AND FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/24/18. 5/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
GPO Jul 12 2018
MEMORANDUM. AN APPROPRIATE ORDER FOLLOWS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/12/18. 7/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
GPO Jul 12 2018
ORDER THAT DOC DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 95) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/12/18. 7/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )

Docket last updated: 06/18/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 07, 2019
139 139 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Fri 02/08 9:40 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION SEEKING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED; THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS APPROVED PURSUANT TO FRCP 23(e). THE ATTORNEYS' FEES AS OUTLINED IN THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ARE GRANTED; THE COURT EXPRESSLY RETAINS JURISDICTION UNTIL 6/30/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/7/19.2/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
138 138 trial Exhibit Thu 02/07 10:31 AM
EXHIBITS 1, 2, and 3 presented at the Motion Hearing on 2/5/19 are filed under seal. (pr, ) (tjd, )
Related: [-]
137 137 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/07 10:27 AM
ORDER THAT THE COURT'S EXHIBITS 1, 2, AND 3 AT THE MOTION HEARING HELD ON 2/5/19 ARE SEALED AND IMPOUNDED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/6/19. 2/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
Related: [-]
136 136 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 02/06 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA Motion for Approval of Class Action Settlement was held on 2/5/19 Court Reporter: MICHAEL BECK. (jaa, )
Related: [-]