Hixon v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:10-bk-62071
Lead BK case is: 5:10-bk-62071
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Arthur S Weissbrodt |
Case #: | 5:15-ap-05068 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Rose Hixon
1091 Erin Way
Campbell, CA 95008 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Wed 12/14 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 12/14/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/13 3:35 PM
Adversary Case Closed 5:15-ap-5068. (yw) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
order
Dismiss Case
Mon 12/12 11:53 AM
Order After Status Conference . Case DISMISSED without prejudice. (mab) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
audio
audio
Tue 12/06 2:45 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/6/2016 1:46:08 PM ]. File Size [ 524 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:11 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Wed 12/07 7:38 AM
Courtroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 12/6/2016 re: Status Conference. Court Abstains from hearing matter. Case shall proceed in State Court. Appearance(s): Robert Bailey present. (mab) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Status Conference Statement
Wed 11/30 11:56 PM
Status Conference Statement for Hearing 12/06/16 . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry) |
|
Saturday, October 22, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Sat 10/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 10/22/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
court
Hearing Set
Thu 10/20 7:57 AM
NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING re: Status Conference. Please take notice that the hearing currently set for 11/1/2016, is vacated. Status Conference rescheduled for 12/6/2016 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (mab) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
audio
audio
Tue 09/06 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/6/2016 1:30:56 PM ]. File Size [ 332 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:23 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 09/06 1:45 PM
Coutroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 9/6/2016 re: Status Conference. The hearing is continued to 11/01/2016 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): Sandi Colabianchi and Robert Bailey present. (mab) |
||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Conference Statement
Wed 08/31 7:39 PM
DEBTOR/PLAINTIFFS STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry) ERROR: PAGE ONE OF THE PDF REFLECTS OAKLAND DIVISION. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 9/1/2016 (yw) |
|
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Conference Statement
Tue 08/30 4:12 PM
Status Conference Statement for September 6, 2016 Status Conference . Filed by Trustee Doris A. Kaelin (Colabianchi, Sandi) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
audio
audio
Thu 08/04 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/4/2016 11:02:05 AM ]. File Size [ 2148 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:57 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Adv )
Thu 08/04 12:56 PM
Courtroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 8/4/2016 re:30 Order To Show Cause. OSC - WITHDRAWN. Status Conference scheduled for 9/6/2016 at 01:30 PM Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Joint Status Statement due 7 days prior to hearing. Appearance(s): Sandi Colabianch, Matthew Pero, and Perry Popovich present. (mab) |
||
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Wed 08/03 12:26 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to OSC Why Case Should No Be Dismissed . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry) |
|
Saturday, May 07, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Sat 05/07 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 05/07/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 05, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
court
Hearing Dropped
Thu 05/05 8:00 AM
NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING re:30 Order To Show Cause. Please take notice that due to the court's unavailability, the hearing currently set for 5/26/2016 is vacated. The hearing is rescheduled for 8/4/2016 at 11:00 AM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky . (mab) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/29 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/29/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Show Cause for Dismissal
Wed 04/27 4:18 PM
Order to Show Cause . Show Cause hearing scheduled for 5/26/2016 at 11:00 AM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (yw) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice
Tue 04/12 12:23 PM
Notice Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference . Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailey, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
audio
audio
Thu 03/17 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/17/2016 11:01:51 AM ]. File Size [ 104 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:26 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Thu 03/17 11:04 AM
Courtroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 3/17/2016 re:11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. OFF CALENDAR . Appearance(s): None. (mab) |
||
Sunday, December 06, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Sun 12/06 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 12/06/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
court
Hearing Set
Fri 12/04 7:29 AM
|
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Wed 10/28 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 10/28/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing Set
Fri 10/23 11:11 PM
NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING re: Status Conference and11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Due to the Court's unavailability, please be advised that the hearing currently set for 11/5/2015, is vacated. Hearing rescheduled for 12/10/2015 at 11:00 AM Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky . (mab) |
|
Sunday, August 09, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Sun 08/09 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 08/09/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Reply
Fri 08/07 8:15 PM
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS Related document(s)20 Opposition Brief/Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon. Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bailey, Robert). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED LINKAGE TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 8/10/2015 (yw) |
|
21 | 21
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Adv )
Fri 08/07 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Continued Hearing. Please take notice that the hearings currently set for 8/13/2015 & 9/8/2015 are vacated.11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Wells Fargo Bank and Status Conference are both Rescheduled for 11/5/2015 at 11:00 AM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (mab) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Fri 07/31 4:03 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Document
Wed 07/29 2:15 PM
Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference to the District Court. . (yw) |
|
Att: 1 additional documents | ||
Att: 2 additional documents | ||
Att: 3 additional documents | ||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
audio
audio
Thu 07/23 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/23/2015 1:13:49 PM ]. File Size [ 1372 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:43 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Thu 07/23 1:28 PM
Courtroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 7/23/2015 re: Status. Further Hearing scheduled for 09/08/2015 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): Perry Popovich and Robert Bailey present. (mab) |
||
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Case Management Conference Statement
Mon 07/20 1:03 AM
PLAINTIFFS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT Related document(s)2 Summons Issued. Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry). CORRECTIVE ENTRY(1): COURT MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT TO MATCH PDF. CORRECTIVE ENTRY(2): COURT MODIFIED LINKAGE TO MATCH PDF. ERROR: EVENT SELECTED DOES NOT MATCH PDF. Modified on 7/20/2015 (yw) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Request to Take Judicial Notice
Wed 07/15 2:12 AM
Request To Take Judicial Notice . Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bailey, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdrawal of Reference
Wed 07/15 2:10 AM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Fee Amount $176. Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailey, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/15 2:16 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-05068 [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00). Receipt number 25006518, amount $ 176.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 07/10 6:33 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2015 at 11:00 AM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailey, Robert) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request to Take Judicial Notice
Thu 07/09 7:54 PM
Request To Take Judicial Notice . Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bailey, Robert). ERROR-1:INCORRECT JUDGE NAME AND JUDGE INITIALS ON PDF. ERROR-2:INCORRECT COURTROOM NUMBER LISTED ON PDF. Modified on 7/10/2015 (klr) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 07/09 7:52 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2015 at 03:00 PM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Hammond. Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailey, Robert). ERROR-1:HEARING DATE APPEARS TO BE SET ON A SUNDAY. ERROR-2:INCORRECT COURTROOM NUMBER LISTED FOR HEARING ON PDF. ERROR-3:INCORRECT JUDGE INITIALS AND JUDGE NAME ON PDF. Modified on 7/10/2015 (klr) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 07/09 7:36 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailey, Robert). ERROR-1:INCORRECT JUDGE NAME AND JUDGE INITIALS LISTED ON PDF. ERROR-2:INCORRECT COURTROOM NUMBER LISTED FOR HEARING ON PDF. Modified on 7/10/2015 (klr) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 03, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Sat 07/04 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 07/03/2015. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/04 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 07/03/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Continue Hearing
Wed 07/01 5:57 PM
Order To Continue Hearing . Status Conference scheduled for 7/23/2015 at 01:00 PM Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky for 1 , . (tm) |
|
7 | 7
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 07/01 10:23 AM
Judge Roger L. Efremsky added to case. Involvement of Judge Arthur S. Weissbrodt Terminated.(Admin.) |
|
Saturday, June 27, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Sat 06/27 5:09 PM
SUMMONS SERVICE EXECUTED Summons, Complaint, Order CMC . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry). ERROR: INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT TO REFLECT PDF. Modified on 6/29/2015 (kd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit OrderSettingTelephonic CMC | ||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Document
Wed 06/24 11:00 PM
Document: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet. . Filed by Plaintiff Janice Rose Hixon (Popovich, Perry) ERROR: WRONG EVENT SELECTED. Modified on 6/25/2015 (yw) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
4 | 4 BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 06/12/2015. (Admin.) | |
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
3 | 3 Order To File Required Documents and Notice Regarding Dismissal Incomplete Filings due by 6/24/2015. (yw) | |
2 | 2 Summons Issued on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Answer Due 7/10/2015 . Status Conference scheduled for 7/23/2015 at 02:30 PM at San Jose Courtroom 3020 - Weissbrodt. (yw) | |
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-05068 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 24810037, amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 Adversary case[LINK 15-05068 . 14 Complaint by Janice Rose Hixon against Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Fee Amount $350. (Popovich, Perry) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT MODIFIED PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S NAME TO MATCH PDF. Modified on 6/10/2015 (yw). |