Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund et al v. P.I. Construction LLC
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vanessa L Bryant |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00926 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 14, 2015 7:35 AM EST |
Defendant
P.I. Construction LLC
|
|
Defendant
P.I. Construction, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Connecticut Laborers District Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 03/29 3:20 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund against P.I. Construction, LLC Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/29/16.(Fernandez, C.) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Tue 03/29 3:25 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fernandez, C.) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 03/22 1:07 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55, as the Plaintiffs' claim is for a sum certain and is supported by affidavits showing the amount due. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against Defendant P.I. Construction, LLC in the total amount of $49,968.97, which includes delinquent contributions in the amount of $39,761.52, liquidated damages in the amount of $7,952.30, costs of $505.15 and attorney's fees in the amount of $1,750. Plaintiffs may recover post-judgment interest as provided by law. The Clerk is further directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/22/16. (Shechter, N.) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 02/10 3:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to P.I. Construction LLC by Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Hughes, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Diane Klobukowski, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Collective Bargaining Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Remittance Reports, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Brendan Hughes | ||
Sunday, February 07, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Sun 02/07 3:35 PM
ORDER denying13 Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice to refiling in the form specified in the first paragraph of Chambers Practices. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2-7-16. (Bryant, Vanessa) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 02/05 2:41 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to P.I. Construction LLC by Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund.(Hughes, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Diane Klobukowski, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Collective Bargaining Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Remittance Reports, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Brendan Hughes | ||
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)
Wed 01/13 12:48 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Motion for default judgment due by 2/12/2016. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a).. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/16. (Blue, A.) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Entry 55(a)
Tue 08/25 12:34 PM
MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to P.I. Construction LLC by Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Hughes, Brendan) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/29 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund. P.I. Construction LLC served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (Hughes, Brendan) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 06/19 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *P.I. Construction LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brendan L. Hughes* *Robert M.Cheverie & Associates, PC* *Commerce Center One, 333 East River Dr.,Ste. 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108*. (Grady, B.) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response
Thu 06/18 3:56 PM
RESPONSE Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases filed by Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Hughes, Brendan) |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 06/18 10:52 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to P.I. Construction LLC. (Hughes, Brendan) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Electronic Service Documents
Wed 06/17 4:28 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Order Re: Chambers Practices,5 Protective Order,1 Complaint,, filed by Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund,6 Notice,3 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Wed 06/17 4:25 PM
Notice to parties Re: Initial Discovery Protocols: Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocol | ||
5 | 5
order
Protective Order
Wed 06/17 4:24 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Re: Chambers Practices
Wed 06/17 4:23 PM
ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
3 | 3
order
Electronic Filing Order
Wed 06/17 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Wed 06/17 4:21 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 09/17/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2015; Discovery due by 12/17/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2016. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2015.(Grady, B.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/17 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against P.I. Construction LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3638132.), filed by Trustees of the New England Laborers' Labor-Management Trust Fund, Connecticut Laborers District Council, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Health Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the New England Laborers' Health and Safety Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Laborers' Annuity Fund.(Hughes, Brendan) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/17 3:39 PM
Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Malone, P.) |