MRAS v. ZUPCIC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gene Ek Pratter |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-03382 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 13, 2015 8:46 AM EST |
Defendant
ALEXA ZUPCIC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD MRAS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
POLLY ZUPCIC
Terminated: 07/14/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Thu 01/07 3:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/7/16. 1/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 01/04 4:02 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RESCHEDULE THE ARBITRATION IN THIS CASE FOR A DATE IN MARCH 2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/30/15. 1/4/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/04 11:57 AM
NOTICE by RICHARD MRAS Letter to Court Reporting Case Settled (WEITZ, DANA) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 10/07 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 1/6/2016 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(rt) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Referring Case to Arbitration
Tue 10/06 10:08 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION AND APPOINTING CHERYL J. BAFFA, ESQ., ROGER F. PERRY, ESQ., AND JONATHAN J. SOBEL, ESQ. TO SERVE AS ARBITRATORS ON TUESDAY NOVEMBER 17, 2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/5/2015. 10/6/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/15 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 11/17/2015 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(rt) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/15 11:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY SHALL PROCEED PROMPTLY AND CONTINUE IN SUCH A MANNER AS WILL ASSURE COMPLETION NO LATER THAN 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THE LAST ANSWER, ETC. ANY SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 30 DAYS PRIOR TO THE DATE OF THE ARBITRATION TRIAL, ETC. ADDITIONAL INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/15/15. 7/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 07/14 2:28 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT POLLY ZUPCIC IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/14/15. 7/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Fri 07/10 8:24 AM
STIPULATION to dismiss Polly Zupcic without prejudice by ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC. (BLAKE, KEVIN) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/10 8:22 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC. (BLAKE, KEVIN) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/10 8:21 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC.(BLAKE, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER GLAZER SHORR on behalf of ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC (SHORR, JENNIFER) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/02 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN M. BLAKE on behalf of ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC (BLAKE, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/26 11:57 AM
2 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by RICHARD MRAS re: Ron Stein served Summons and Complaint upon ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC by Personal Service. ALEXA ZUPCIC served on 6/24/2015, answer due 7/15/2015; POLLY ZUPCIC served on 6/24/2015, answer due 7/15/2015. (va, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/17 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT against ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 122885.), filed by RICHARD MRAS.(rt) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/17 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to ALEXA ZUPCIC, POLLY ZUPCIC. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on June 17, 2015 (rt) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 06/17 8:52 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RICHARD MRAS. (rt) |
||
adr
Case Eligible for Arbitration
Wed 06/17 8:53 AM
Case Eligible for Arbitration(rt) |