In re: Variant Holding Company, LLC.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory M Sleet |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00513 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Debtor
Variant Holding Company, LLC.
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 16, 2015 8:16 AM EST |
Appellant
Conix WH Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Conix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Numeric Holdings Company, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Variant Royalty Group, LP
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Walker's Dream Trust
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Variant Holding Company, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beach Point Funds
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 21 2015
Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/21/15. (kjk) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Case - Civil
Tue 03/15 10:12 AM
CASE CLOSED - See Order (33 ). (mdb) Modified on 3/15/2016 (mdb) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Parties and their Attorneys
Mon 02/22 12:04 PM
SO ORDERED - re (3 in 1:15-cv-00866-GMS) Proposed Order filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC., (32 in 1:15-cv-00513-GMS) Proposed Order, filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC., (16 in 1:15-cv-00906-GMS) Proposed Order. Attorney Joseph J. McMahon, Jr; Daniel Kevin Astin and John Daniel McLaughlin, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/19/2016. (mdb) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 02/18 3:34 PM
PROPOSED ORDER for Ciardi Ciardi & Astin and Mesch, Clark & Rothschild, P.C. to Withdraw as Counsel to Appellants re31 MOTION for Ciardi Ciardi & Astin and Mesch Clark & Rothschild, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney (Stipulated) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 02/12 10:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2016. Discussion regarding the pending motions to withdraw counsel. The motions will be granted in accordance with the proposed order that is to be jointly filed by next week. (Court Reporter Kevin Maurer.) (mdb) |
||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
order
Oral Order
Mon 02/01 2:26 PM
ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A TELECONFERENCE: A Telephone Conference has been set in this matter for Friday, February 12, 2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gregory M. Sleet to discuss31 MOTION for Ciardi Ciardi & Astin and Mesch Clark & Rothschild, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Ciardi Ciardi & Astin. The parties are directed to contact chambers at (302) 573-4559 once all the participants are on the line. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/1/2016. (asw) |
||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/27 5:18 PM
MOTION for Ciardi Ciardi & Astin and Mesch Clark & Rothschild, P.C. to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Ciardi Ciardi & Astin. (McLaughlin, John) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 09/11 4:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC's and Appellee Beach Point Funds' Joint Request for Oral Argument on 9/11/2015, filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Request for Oral Argument
Thu 09/10 9:52 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellants Reply Brief
Fri 09/04 3:27 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Conix WH Holdings, LLC.(McLaughlin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 5:52 PM
APPENDIX re24 Appellee's Brief Volume 3 of 3 by Beach Point Funds.(Maddox, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1 of 3, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2 of 3, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3 of 3 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 5:49 PM
APPENDIX re24 Appellee's Brief Volume 2 of 3 by Beach Point Funds.(Maddox, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1 of 5, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2 of 5, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3 of 5, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix Part 4 of 5, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix Part 5 of 5 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 5:45 PM
APPENDIX re24 Appellee's Brief Volume 1 of 3 by Beach Point Funds.(Maddox, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Part 1 of 6, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Part 2 of 6, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Part 3 of 6, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix Part 4 of 6, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix Part 5 of 6, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix Part 6 of 6 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellees Brief
Fri 08/21 5:33 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by Beach Point Funds. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/8/2015.(Maddox, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
23 | 23
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:50 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 6 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC..(Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service with Service List | ||
22 | 22
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:48 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 5 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:46 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 4 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:45 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 3 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:43 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 2 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/21 4:42 PM
APPENDIX re17 Answering Brief in Opposition of Appellee Variant Holding Company, LLC (Vol. 1 of 6) by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition
Fri 08/21 3:30 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015.(Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service with Service List | ||
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Appendix
Fri 08/07 2:57 PM
APPENDIX re15 Appellant's Brief by Conix WH Holdings, LLC, Conix, Inc..(McLaughlin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal - Appellants Brief
Fri 08/07 2:52 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Conix WH Holdings, LLC, Conix, Inc.. Appellee Brief due by 8/24/2015.(McLaughlin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 07/27 3:00 PM
SO ORDERED - re14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael McGrath filed by Conix WH Holdings, LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/27/2015. (mdb) |
||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/24 11:10 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael McGrath - filed by Conix WH Holdings, LLC. (McLaughlin, John) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Order Setting Briefing Schedule - BK Appeal
Thu 07/23 2:51 PM
ORDER re12 Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation, ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 8/7/2015., Appellee Brief due by 8/21/2015., Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/4/2015.). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/23/2015. (asw) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Recommendation that BK Appeal be Withrawn from Mediation
Wed 07/22 9:27 AM
Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/21/15. (kjk) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/20 4:31 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maxim B. Litvak of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP - filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/20 4:29 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Pachulski of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP - filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC.. (Keane, Peter) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 07/20 11:46 AM
SO ORDERED - re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Neumeister filed by Beach Point Funds,6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suzzanne Uhland filed by Beach Point Funds. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/20/2015. (mdb) |
||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 07/20 5:04 PM
SO ORDERED - re10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Pachulski of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC.,11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maxim B. Litvak of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/20/2015. (mdb) |
||
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation of Record
Fri 07/17 5:21 PM
DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC. /Debtor's and Beach Point Funds' Notice of Filing Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 8009-1(b) of Undocketed Items Identified in Their Joint Counter Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal(Keane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits - Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits - Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits - Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibits - Part 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibits - Part 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibits - Part 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibits - Part 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibits - Part 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibits - Part 9 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation of Record
Fri 07/17 1:32 PM
COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal - filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC.(rwc) |
|
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal | ||
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/16 4:22 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael S. Neumeister - filed by Beach Point Funds. (Maddox, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/16 4:13 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Suzzanne Uhland - filed by Beach Point Funds. (Maddox, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation of Record
Thu 07/16 3:45 PM
APPELLANTS' NOTICE OF FILING OF UNDOCKETED ITEMS IDENTIFIED IN THEIR DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL filed by Conix WH Holdings, LLC, Conix, Inc., Numeric Holdings Company, LLC., Variant Royalty Group, LP, Walker's Dream Trust(klc) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation of Record
Tue 07/07 12:04 PM
DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Conix WH Holdings, LLC, Conix, Inc., Numeric Holdings Company, LLC., Variant Royalty Group, LP, Walker's Dream Trust(rwc) |
|
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal | ||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Oral Order
Mon 06/29 11:47 AM
ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Monday, July 20, 2015, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be delivered to the Clerks Office of the District Court. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/29/15. (cak) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
utility
- CORRECTING ENTRY
Thu 06/25 3:50 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced DI# 2 Notice of Docketing with corrected document. (sar) |
||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/24 12:43 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - Notice of Docketing - Mediation
Fri 06/19 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sar) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Fri 06/19 11:55 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 6/5/15 by Judge Brendan L Shannon in Bankruptcy case number 14-12021 Fee was paid.- filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC..(sar) Modified on 6/19/2015 (sar) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal | ||
notice
Bankruptcy Appeal - No Designation of Record Filed
Fri 06/19 1:42 PM
NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (sar) |