Oberalis LLC v. Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 16, 2015 7:17 AM CST |
Defendant
Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oberalis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 10/29 11:47 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 10/29 11:02 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Corcoran, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 10/29 10:03 AM
FILED IN ERROR- ATTORNEY RE-FILED Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Corcoran, Peter) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nkl, ) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/29 9:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2015. (nkl, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 10/29 11:45 AM
***FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY RE-FILED. Document # 10, Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) |
||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Sat 08/29 1:07 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. Cause No. 2:15-cv-0950 is designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial.The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/27/15. (mll, ) |
|
utility
Remark
Sat 08/29 2:00 PM
This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 2:15cv950 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/25 12:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent L Brands, Inc. for Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Brean, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/25 12:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC.(Brean, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/06 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oberalis LLC for Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/28 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent E Baldauf, Jr on behalf of Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (Baldauf, Kent) |
|
3 | 3
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/28 2:51 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC.( Brean, Daniel) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/28 3:39 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC to 9/14/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/15 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (nkl, ) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/22 2:47 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Mon 06/22 2:47 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/19 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT for patent infringement against Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5253605.), filed by Oberalis LLC.(Corcoran, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A USP 5911140, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |