Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:15-cv-00986
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2015
Terminated:Jul 15, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2015 8:34 AM CST
Defendant
Chris Koster
Represented By
John A. Hirth
Attorney General Of Missouri
contact info
Defendant
Jeremiah Jay Nixon
Represented By
John A. Hirth
Attorney General Of Missouri
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Doe
7 Fredon Marksboro Road
Newton, NJ 07860
Represented By
William J. Mac Naughton
W. James Mac Naughton
contact info
Plaintiff
The Satanic Temple
7 Fredon Marksboro Road
Newton, NJ 07860
Represented By
Ronald J. Eisenberg
Schultz And Associates, L.L.P.
contact info
William J. Mac Naughton
W. James Mac Naughton
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2018 11:59 PM CST
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
25 25 appeal Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA Wed 1:01 PM
Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for22 Notice of Appeal filed by The Satanic Temple, Mary Doe USCA Appeal Number: 16-3387 Notice of Appeal treated as: noa Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: Yes(CLA)
Related: [-]
24 24 appeal Letter from USCA Wed 12:28 PM
LETTER from USCA USCA Appeal #: 16-3387 CLA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
23 23 appeal Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement Fri 8:45 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case. Notice of Appeal filed on 8/11/16 by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(JWD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 9:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0865-5535231.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form A-Aooeak Information Form
Friday, July 15, 2016
21 21 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 2:34 PM
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No9 ], is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/15/2016. (CASE TERMINATED.) (GGB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2015
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 5:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
19 19 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 1:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. (CLA)
Related: [-]
18 18 order A Docket Text Order Tue 1:41 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:17 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple.(Mac Naughton, William) filed by The Satanic Temple, Mary Doe ; ORDERED LEAVE GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/3/15. (CLA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 31, 2015
17 17 motion Leave to Sat 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple.(Mac Naughton, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-PROPOSED MEMORANDUM
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
16 16 order A Docket Text Order Wed 3:24 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Memorandum in Support of Motion,9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. (Mac Naughton, William) filed by The Satanic Temple, Mary Doe; GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING 11/2/15 HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/14/15. (CLA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 11, 2015
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sun 10:23 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Memorandum in Support of Motion,9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. (Mac Naughton, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2015
14 14 order A Docket Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 4:20 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by The Satanic Temple, Mary Doe; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/11/15. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 9:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Memorandum in Support of Motion,9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple. (Mac Naughton, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
12 12 25 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 3:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (KJS)
Related: [-]
11 11 order A Docket Text Order Wed 3:42 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:10 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Jeremiah Jay Nixon, Chris Koster; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/9/15. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
10 10 motion File in Excess of Page Limitation Leave to Tue 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation , MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, Not to Exceed 18 Pages by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon.(Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
9 9 motion Dismiss Case Tue 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
8 8 order A Docket Text Order Wed 8:28 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John) filed by Jeremiah Jay Nixon, Chris Koster ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/2/15. (CLA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10:29 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
6 6 order A Docket Text Order Wed 2:07 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John) filed by Jeremiah Jay Nixon, Chris Koster ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/26/15. (CLA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 5:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 9:54 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by John A. Hirth for Defendants Chris Koster, Jeremiah Jay Nixon. (Hirth, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
3 3 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 12:10 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald J. Eisenberg for Plaintiff The Satanic Temple. (Eisenberg, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Tue 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple Process Server: Guaranteed Subpoena Service (BAK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4922359, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Mary Doe, The Satanic Temple.(Mac Naughton, William) (BAK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-THE BOOKLET,
Att: 2 Summons J. NIXON,
Att: 3 Summons C. KOSTER,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 5 (6/23/2015) Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 11:36 AM
Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney William J. Mac Naughton. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
Related: [-]