Oracle USA, Inc. et al v. Rimini Street, Inc. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Larry R Hicks |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:10-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2010 |
Re-opened: | Jun 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 6:38 PM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Rimini Street, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Seth Ravin
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Rimini Street, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Oracle America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Oracle International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Oracle USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rimini Street, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seth Ravin
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CedarCrestone, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oracle USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oracle International Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oracle America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Violating Terms of Use Isn't a Crime, EFF Tells Court -- Again (eff.org) |
Submitted Tue 02/07/2017 | |
2. | A Legal Showdown With Oracle Threatens A Software Company That Just Filed A $60 Million IPO (businessinsider.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/20/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
notice
MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Mon 01/08 10:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:10-cv-00106-LRH-MDC . (no image attached) (ABG) |