PSAROS v. GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Jose L Linares |
Referred: | Joseph A Dickson |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04277 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 21, 2015 7:18 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOES I-X
|
|
Cross Defendant
STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES I-X
|
|
Defendant
STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN PSAROS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Stipulation and Order
Sun 01/22 3:05 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/20/2017. (seb) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/19 11:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.. (VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/07 11:40 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE W/O PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/6/2016. (seb) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/31 11:35 AM
STATUS REPORT by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.. (VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Tue 07/19 8:32 AM
ORDER staying discovery pending further Court Order. The parties shall submit a status report on or before 8/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/18/2016. (seb) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/15 3:01 PM
STATUS REPORT by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.. (VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/16 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL SCHLEIFSTEIN on behalf of GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.(SCHLEIFSTEIN, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
Mon 06/13 12:03 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JARED JAMES LIMBACH terminated. (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 06/13 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/13/2016. Parties to submit joint written status report by 7/15/16. (nm, ) |
||
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/09 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE MARY O'BRIEN on behalf of STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC (O'BRIEN, MICHELLE) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 05/09 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/9/2016. Telephone status conference scheduled for 6/13/16 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, ) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Mon 04/25 2:23 PM
TEXT ORDER: Per the request of counsel and with consent, the telephone status conference scheduled for 4/26/16 has been rescheduled to 5/9/16 at 11:45 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/25/16. (nm, ) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/21 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA W. DENBEAUX on behalf of STEVEN PSAROS (DENBEAUX, JOSHUA) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 02/22 10:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/22/2016. Telephone status conference scheduled for 4/26/16 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, ) |
||
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 12/22 8:25 AM
ORDER - Stern Lavinthal's15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2015. (anr) |
|
27 | 27
16
pgs
order
Opinion
Tue 12/22 8:24 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2015. (anr) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/30 5:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/23 12:07 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by STEVEN PSAROS re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Mon 11/02 10:47 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Wed 10/28 5:11 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim of Ditech Financial LLC/Green Tree Servicing LLC by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC.(LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/28 10:21 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/22/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2016. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/27/2015. (anr) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 10/27 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/27/2015. (nm, ) |
||
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Mon 10/26 4:36 PM
Defendant Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim for Indemnification and Contribution , CROSSCLAIM against STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC..(VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Tue 10/20 4:49 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by STEVEN PSAROS.(DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Mon 10/19 9:43 AM
ORDER granting request for an adjournment of the Motion for Judgment from 11/2/2015 to 11/16/2015. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/15/2015. (anr) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/19 9:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 11/16/2015 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr) |
||
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/16 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PETER COLONNA-ROMANO on behalf of GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC.(COLONNA-ROMANO, PETER) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Thu 10/15 12:02 PM
Letter re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 10/14 9:41 AM
ORDER - Defendants request to withdraw13 Motion to Dismiss is granted. The motion to dismiss13 is hereby terminated as withdrawn.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/13/2015. (anr) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 10/09 3:24 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2015(LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 16 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 17 Cover Letter for Courtesy Copies | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 10/09 3:00 PM
Letter re13 MOTION to Dismiss . (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/09 11:33 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2015(LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 16 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 17 Courtesy Copy Letter | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/09 11:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/09 3:38 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 11/2/2015 before Judge Jose L. Linares. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr) |
||
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/04 9:42 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC. (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 08/17 10:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC., JOHN DOES I-X by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC.(LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 08/11 9:21 AM
TEXT ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/27/2015 02:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Joint proposed pretrial discovery plan is to be e-filed with the Court by 10/20/15. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/11/15. (nm, ) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/07 9:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC..(VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/07 9:22 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC. identifying Walter Investment Management Corp as Corporate Parent..(VAUGHN, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 08/06 2:32 PM
LETTER ORDER - You are hereby directed to move this civil action, by requesting that a default and default judgment be entered or submitting an extension to answer out of time, within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on Thursday, 8/20/2015 at 9:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/6/2015. (anr) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/05 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN PSAROS. GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC. served on 7/15/2015, answer due 8/5/2015. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Mon 08/03 2:44 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer.(LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/03 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED JAMES LIMBACH on behalf of STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC (LIMBACH, JARED) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Mon 08/03 3:59 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/17/2015. (anr) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/23 11:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEVEN PSAROS. STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC served on 7/13/2015, answer due 8/3/2015. (DEUTSCH, ADAM) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/25 3:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC., STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/25 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT against GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC., JOHN DOES I-X, STERN LAVINTHAL & FRANKENBERG LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6472627) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STEVEN PSAROS.(ld, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |