Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas v. Stokes Land Group, LLLP
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian J Davis |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00807 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 26, 2015 7:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Stokes Land Group, LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, November 20, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order dismissing case
Fri 11/20 3:53 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/20/2015. (AMP) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/29 3:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
order
*Order no pdf
Fri 10/23 3:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER Discharging 27 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of dismissal without prejudice on or before October 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/23/2015. (AMP) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Response to order to show cause
Thu 10/22 5:00 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re27 Order to show cause filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order to show cause
Tue 10/06 5:03 PM
ORDER to Show Cause requiring response by October 23, 2015. Failure to timely or adequately respond may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/6/2015. (AMP) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on motion to extend time
Tue 10/06 1:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting25 the defendant's motion for more time to respond to the plaintiff's discovery. The defendant must respond by October 19, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/6/2015. (Barksdale, Patricia) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend time
Fri 10/02 4:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery by Stokes Land Group, LLLP. (Nicandri, Peter) |
|
24 | 24
respoth
Response
Fri 10/02 2:41 PM
RESPONSE re 23 Order no pdf filed by Stokes Land Group, LLLP. (Nicandri, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
*Order no pdf
Wed 09/23 5:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER construing 20 Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Colorado River Abstention and Incorporated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery as a Motion for Leave to Take Jurisdictional Discovery ("Motion"). Defendant shall file a response to the Motion, not to exceed ten (10) pages in length, on or before October 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/23/2015. (AMP) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Case management and scheduling order
Fri 09/18 12:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/25/2016; Conduct mediation hearing by 3/31/2016; Dispositive motions due by 4/22/2016; Pretrial statement due by 8/17/2016; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Bench Trial set for trial term commencing on 9/6/2016 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/17/2015.(AMP) |
|
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheets | ||
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Case Management Report
Wed 09/16 4:21 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Response
Tue 09/15 4:38 PM
RESPONSE re18 Order re Colorado River Abstention and Incorporated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas.(Morreale, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXH. 1 to Plaintiff's Statement re Colorado River Abstention | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Response
Tue 09/15 11:41 AM
RESPONSE re4 Order,18 Order filed by Stokes Land Group, LLLP.(Nicandri, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of John C. Kunkel | ||
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Wed 08/19 4:20 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide to the Court on or before September 21, 2015, sufficient information so the Court can determine whether it can appropriately exercise jurisdiction over this case. Failure to respond as required may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/19/2015. (AMP) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Fri 08/14 5:20 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stokes Land Group, LLLP. Related case(s): y (Nicandri, Peter) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 08/14 5:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stokes Land Group, LLLP identifying Other Affiliate Hugh H. Connerty, Other Affiliate Stokes Holding, LLLP, Other Affiliate Stokes Land Group, LLLP, Other Affiliate SLG GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Stokes SLG, Ltd., Other Affiliate Connerty SLG, Ltd., Other Affiliate Kunkel SLG, LLC, Other Affiliate Bergmann SLG, Ltd., Other Affiliate Masher Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate Hugh H. Connerty Jr. Dynasty Trust, Other Affiliate John C. Kunkel Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Thomas C Bergmann, Other Affiliate SLG Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate Stokes Land Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Stokes Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Masher 36, LLC, Other Affiliate Kunkel Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Bergmann Management, LLC, Other Affiliate E. Chester Stokes, Jr., Other Affiliate John C. Kunkel, Other Affiliate Tuscano, LLC for Stokes Land Group, LLLP.. (Nicandri, Peter) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/14 5:02 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Stokes Land Group, LLLP.(Nicandri, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Amended document (NOT Motion)
Wed 08/12 8:50 AM
AMENDED RESPONSE to Motion re11 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to1 Complaint Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) Modified on 8/12/2015 to edit text (PAM) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response to motion
Wed 08/12 8:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint : Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Second Motion filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/11 2:27 PM
ORDER granting 11 the defendant's second motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The defendant must respond to the complaint by August 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 8/11/2015. (BGK) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/07 4:57 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Stokes Land Group, LLLP. (Gillam, Wiley) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of change of address
Wed 08/05 11:16 AM
NOTICE of change of address by Frank Edward Morreale (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/30 3:11 PM
NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas re6 MOTION for leave to file (Serve) Jurisdictional Discovery & accompanying Plaintiff's Statement of Jurisdictional Facts SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 3.01(g) STATEMENT (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/28 10:53 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 the defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. The defendant must respond to the complaint by August 10, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on July 28, 2015. (ASL) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/24 2:37 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to1 Complaint by Stokes Land Group, LLLP. (Nicandri, Peter) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 7/24/2015 to edit text (KJR) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 07/22 1:24 PM
MOTION for leave to file (Serve) Jurisdictional Discovery & accompanying Plaintiff's Statement of Jurisdictional Facts by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 07/14 10:57 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Morreale, Frank) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 07/06 12:23 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide to the Court on or before July 28, 2015, sufficient information so the Court can determine whether it has jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/6/2015. (AMP) Modified on 7/6/2015 (AMP) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Thu 07/02 3:48 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Stokes Land Group, LLLP. (PAM) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Wed 07/01 5:13 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/1/2015.(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Case Management Report Form, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Letter and Form | ||
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/30 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Stokes Land Group, LLLP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX16714) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas.(NAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |