Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Becky R Thorson
Case #: 0:15-cv-02900
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2015
Terminated:Dec 07, 2015
Last checked: Monday Dec 28, 2015 6:05 AM CST
Defendant
VDI Space, Inc.
Plaintiff
NCS Pearson, Inc.
Represented By
Peter M Lancaster
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 07, 2015
10 10 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 12/7/2015. (BJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2015
9 9 service Certificate of Service on Proposed Order Fri 10:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by NCS Pearson, Inc. re8 Stipulation of Dismissal (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by NCS Pearson, Inc.. (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
7 7 service Certificate of Service Tue 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NCS Pearson, Inc. re6 Amended Complaint (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 3:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against VDI Space, Inc.. Filed by NCS Pearson, Inc.. No summons requested. (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2015
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Pearson, Inc.. VDI Space, Inc. served on 7/19/2015, answer due 8/10/2015. (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
4 4 1 pgs discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 2:38 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. PN Holdings, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Plaintiff NCS Pearson, Inc.. Pearson, plc is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff NCS Pearson, Inc.. (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to VDI Space, Inc. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 1:19 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 15-CV-2900 (DWF/BRT). (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against VDI Space, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4477805.) Filed by NCS Pearson, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Lancaster, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet