Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eric N Vitaliano |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-03888 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 29, 2015 8:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/28 11:12 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, The Court having been advised by the pltffs (ECF Dkt. #26), that this action has become moot as a result of the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut's confirmed plan of reorganization, which discharged the deft's obligations to the pltffs. Therefore, this action is discontinued without cost. The Clerk is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/27/2017) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Thu 09/14 2:12 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding defendant's bankruptcy case by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 06/19 11:39 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Parties shall file a joint status report letter either (i) at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or (ii) by September 12, 2017 , whichever is earlier. The stay remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/19/2017. (Fielding, Peter) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Mon 06/12 4:22 PM
Letter by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 03/10 9:52 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Parties are to file a joint status report letter at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or by 6/15/2017 , whichever is sooner. The stay remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 3/10/2017. (Fielding, Peter) |
||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 03/09 7:35 PM
Letter by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 12/12 2:04 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Parties are to file a joint status report letter at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or by 3/9/2017 , whichever is sooner. The stay remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/12/2016. (Fielding, Peter) |
||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Fri 12/09 7:53 PM
Letter by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 09/13 11:00 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Parties are to file a joint status report letter at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or by 12/9/2016 , whichever is sooner. The stay remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/13/2016. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/12 4:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Mon 09/12 12:34 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Per the Court's 6/13/2016 Order, the parties' joint status report was due 9/9/2016. The parties are to file their joint status report by 9/13/2016. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/12/2016. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 06/13 12:58 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. The Parties are to file a joint status report letter at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or by 9/9/2016 , whichever is sooner. The stay remains in effect. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/13/2016. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/10 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Tenenbaum on behalf of Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (aty to be noticed) (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/10 4:19 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Tenenbaum, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
order
Order Staying Case Status Report Order
Tue 02/02 4:54 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE for Bankruptcy or Appeal Proceeding; STATUS REPORT ORDER: Per the parties' application, the10 motion for default judgment is stayed pending further order of the Court, and the case is stayed pursuant to § 362 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Parties are to file a joint status report letter at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceeding or by 6/2/2016, whichever is sooner. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/2/2016. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 01/27 5:26 PM
Letter to Judge Vitaliano advising of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy filing by Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. (Lauricella, Peter) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 12/14 10:42 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Stay. The10 motion for default judgment is deemed stayed through 1/14/2016. If plaintiffs do not file a notice of voluntary dismissal by 1/14/2016, the stay will be lifted. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/14/2015. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stay
Fri 12/11 4:34 PM
Second MOTION to Stay re10 MOTION for Default Judgment through 1/12/2016 by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund. (Roffe, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 12/09 4:31 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiffs'16 request to stay Plaintiffs'10 motion for default judgment through 12/10/2015 is granted. On or before 12/11/2015, Plaintiffs must file a status report letter. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/9/2015. (Rice, Liane) |
||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 11/10 11:04 AM
Letter requesting that the Court not issue a decision for the pending default judgment motion any earlier than December 10, 2015 by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Roffe, Jonathan) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/10 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Roffe on behalf of Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (aty to be noticed) (Roffe, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/04 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Lauricella on behalf of Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Lauricella, Peter) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 10/05 1:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment Declaration of Kenneth Cook filed by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund. (Marimon, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
12 | 12
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 10/05 1:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment Declaration of Christopher Guy filed by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund. (Marimon, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
11 | 11
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 10/05 1:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 MOTION for Default Judgment Declaration of Nicole Marimon filed by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund. (Marimon, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 10/05 1:30 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund. (Marimon, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/29 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marimon on behalf of Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (aty to be noticed) (Marimon, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/13 5:37 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that Defendant Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of Defendant Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hamilton, Janet) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Thu 08/13 9:24 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Bauman in Support of Request, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Certificate of Default | ||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/24 5:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute. Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. served on 7/15/2015, answer due 8/5/2015. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Arbitration Designation and Procedure
Fri 07/10 10:56 AM
NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) which requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d)(3). (Credle, Rita) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Thu 07/09 2:43 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita) |
||
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/07 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 07/07 1:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 07/07 1:21 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/07 1:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, July 02, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/02 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Coreno Marble & Tile, Ltd. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Tile Layers Local Union 52 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Local 7 Tile Industry Annuity Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |