Jameson et al v. OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Ashely M Chan |
Case #: | 2:15-ap-00309 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc., Defendant
300 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee of CVI Loan GT Trust I, Defendant
7360 South Kyrene T314
Tempe, AZ 85283 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Jameson
91 Sycamore Lane
Glenmoore, PA 19343 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy L. Jameson
91 Sycamore Lane
Glenmoore, PA 19343 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/13 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-309 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (G., Jeanette) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
court
Default Entered
Thu 12/10 11:16 AM
Default Entered Against Defendant U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee of CVI Loan GT Trust I . (G., Jeanette) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Praecipe to Withdraw Document
Wed 12/09 2:39 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Answer to Adversary Complaint Filed by MATTHEW CHRISTIAN WALDT on behalf of OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc. . (WALDT, MATTHEW) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Intent
Thu 09/24 6:27 AM
Notice of Intent Certification of Service for Notice of Default and Certification in Support Thereof Filed by Kathleen Jameson, Randy L. Jameson. (LOHR, ROBERT) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
court
Document
Wed 09/23 4:47 PM
Document in re: Request for Entry of Default Filed by ROBERT J. LOHR II on behalf of Kathleen Jameson, Randy L. Jameson. (LOHR, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Certification in Support | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 | ||
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/27 2:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc..(WALDT, MATTHEW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 07/07 4:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kathleen Jameson 7/7/2015; Randy L. Jameson 7/7/2015 . (LOHR, ROBERT) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 07/07 10:18 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc. Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015; U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee of CVI Loan GT Trust I Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015. (S., Antoinette) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 07/07 3:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-00309 amc) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number No Fee. Fee Amount $ 350.00. (G.) |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/06 12:35 PM
Adversary case 15-00309 Complaint by ROBERT J. LOHR II on behalf of Kathleen Jameson, Randy L. Jameson against OneMain Financial Holdings, Inc., U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee of CVI Loan GT Trust I. Fee Amount $350 . (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (LOHR, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 through 10 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 11 through 14 |