Bankston v. Whetstone Partners LLC.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert N Scola, Jr |
Referred: | Alicia M Otazo-Reyes |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-22574 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 04, 2016 7:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Whetstone Partners LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Brent Bankston
6889 SW 19th Court
North Lauderdale, FL 33068 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail
Thu 01/07 4:30 PM
Clerk's Second Notice of Undeliverable Mail re34 Order Dismissing Case. US Mail returned for: Keith Brent Bankston . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Court notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 12/23 10:42 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/21/2015. (srd) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail
Fri 12/04 4:12 PM
Clerk's First Notice of Undeliverable Mail re32 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. US Mail returned for: Keith Brent Bankston . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 11/24 4:05 PM
Civil Case Closed. The Court administratively closed this case during the pendency of the stay in this action until December 17, 2016. ( See Order, ECF No.32 .) (rss) |
||
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 11/13 12:40 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Steven Steinberg terminated. Deadline to obtain new counsel 12/17/2015. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/13/2015. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 11/10 3:46 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Mark S. Steinberg. by Keith Brent Bankston. Responses due by 11/27/2015(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Initial Disclosure(s)
Wed 11/04 4:42 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) of Initial disclosures Rule 26 Mandatory Initial Disclosures by Whetstone Partners LLC. (White, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/27 2:43 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint Second by Whetstone Partners LLC.. (White, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/13 5:55 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whetstone Partners LLC. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Keith Brent Bankston.(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/13 3:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants26 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to separately file his second amended complaint, consistent with Local Rule 15.1. The Plaintiff must separately refile his second amended complaint by October 16, 2015 . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/13/2015. (rss) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/13 10:59 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint re 24 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, by Keith Brent Bankston. Responses due by 10/30/2015 (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 09/22 3:00 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies as moot19 Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's amended pleading moots the motion to dismiss the prior pleading. See Taylor v. Alabama , 275 F. App'x 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants' motion to dismiss became moot). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/22/2015. (rss) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 09/22 2:58 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants21 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Consistent with Local Rule 15.1, the Plaintiff must separately refile his second amended complaint by September 29, 2015 . The Court admonishes Plaintiff's counsel for failing to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). That Rule requires an attorney filing a motion in a civil case to first confer with opposing counsel in a good-faith effort to resolve by agreement the issues raised in the motion. The filing attorney must then include in the motion a statement explaining to the Court that (1) all or some of the issues raised in the motion are unopposed; (2) counsel conferred but could not agree on all or some of the issues raised in the motion; or (3) counsel diligently attempted to confer but was unable to reach the opposing counsel. S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). "Local Rule 7.1 serves the purpose not only of attempting to avoid unnecessary expenditure of judicial resources resolving motions that are not opposed, but also to allow the Court to ascertain whether it should wait for a response from the opposing party before deciding the motion." Royal Bahamian Ass'n, Inc. v. QBE Ins. Corp. , 744 F. Supp. 2d 1297, 1302 n.7 (S.D. Fla. 2010) (Goodman, Mag. J.). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/22/2015. (rss) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 09/17 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Paul White on behalf of Whetstone Partners LLC.. Attorney Thomas Paul White added to party Whetstone Partners LLC.(pty:dft). (White, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Thu 09/17 9:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and Order of Referral to Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 5/16/2016 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 5/10/2016 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2015., Expert Discovery due by 2/9/2016., Fact Discovery due by 12/22/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2015., In Limine Motions due by 3/15/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2016., Motions due by 3/15/2016., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/18/2016., Status Report due by 11/17/2015.) Mediation Deadline 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/15/2015. (cbr) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/11 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Keith Brent Bankston.(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/11 3:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss14 Amended Complaint Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Cause of Action filed by Keith Brent Bankston. Replies due by 9/21/2015. (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/25 4:30 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss14 Amended Complaint Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Cause of Action by Whetstone Partners LLC.. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Flanigan, James) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/25 4:29 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Whetstone Partners LLC.. (Flanigan, James) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/21 5:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keith Brent Bankston (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/18 4:36 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whetstone Partners LLC. (Flanigan, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/18 11:55 AM
NOTICE by Whetstone Partners LLC. re10 Order, Order Referring Case to Judge Joint Discovery Plan and Conference Report (Flanigan, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/12 5:09 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whetstone Partners LLC. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Keith Brent Bankston.(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 08/12 11:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants12 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Consistent with Local Rule 15.1, the Plaintiff must separately refile his amended complaint by August 19, 2015. The Court denies as moot9 Defendant's motion to dismiss. By filing an amended pleading, the Defendant's motion to dismiss the prior pleading is moot. See Taylor v. Alabama , 275 F. App'x 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants' motion to dismiss became moot). Finally, the Court admonishes Plaintiff's counsel for failing to comply with the Court's local rule regarding pre-filing conferences. Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) requires an attorney filing a motion in a civil case to first confer with opposing counsel in a good-faith effort to resolve by agreement the issues raised in the motion. The filing attorney must then include in the motion a statement explaining to the Court that (1) all or some of the issues raised in the motion are unopposed; (2) counsel conferred but could not agree on all or some of the issues raised in the motion; or (3) counsel diligently attempted to confer but was unable to reach the opposing counsel. S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). "Local Rule 7.1 serves the purpose not only of attempting to avoid unnecessary expenditure of judicial resources resolving motions that are not opposed, but also to allow the Court to ascertain whether it should wait for a response from the opposing party before deciding the motion." Royal Bahamian Ass'n, Inc. v. QBE Ins. Corp. , 744 F. Supp. 2d 1297, 1302 n.7 (S.D. Fla. 2010) (Goodman, Mag. J.). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/12/2015. (rss) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/12 1:06 PM
Set Deadlines per 13 Order. Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2015. (asl) |
||
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 08/10 5:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Keith Brent Bankston.(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint | ||
11 | 11
misc
Memorandum
Mon 08/10 5:50 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint Counts I-IX of Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State Cause of Action by Keith Brent Bankston. (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Order Referring Case to Judge
Mon 07/27 4:20 PM
Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/27/2015. (cbr) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/24 12:32 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint Counts I-IX of Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State Cause of Action by Whetstone Partners LLC.. Responses due by 8/10/2015 (Flanigan, James) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/21 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Barker Flanigan on behalf of Whetstone Partners LLC.. Attorney James Barker Flanigan added to party Whetstone Partners LLC.(pty:dft). (Flanigan, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 07/15 4:51 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Keith Brent Bankston. Whetstone Partners LLC. served on 7/14/2015, answer due 8/4/2015. (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 07/10 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Steven Steinberg on behalf of Keith Brent Bankston (Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/09 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Whetstone Partners LLC.. (jua) |
|
4 | 4
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Thu 07/09 9:16 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jua) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Thu 07/09 9:15 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jua) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Thu 07/09 9:15 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (jua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/08 7:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Whetstone Partners LLC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7895356, filed by Keith Brent Bankston.(Steinberg, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |