American Express Bank, FSB v. Hira
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-02934
Lead BK case is: 6:15-bk-02934
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen S Jennemann |
Case #: | 6:15-ap-00081 |
Nature of Suit | 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2015 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gurvir Hira
12004 Otterbrook Trail
Windermere, FL 34786 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Express Bank, FSB
Post Office Box 3146
Orlando, FL 32802 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 08/05 12:32 PM
Adversary Case 6:15-ap-81 Closed. (Rutha) |
||
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 07/24 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 07/23/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Proof of Service
Wed 07/22 4:11 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion for Approval of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and Dismissing Case. Filed by Gary J Lublin on behalf of Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB . (Lublin, Gary) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Approval
Tue 07/21 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion for Approval of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal . Service Instructions: Gary Lublin is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion for Approval
Thu 07/16 11:40 AM
Motion for Approval of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Gary J Lublin on behalf of Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB . (Lublin, Gary) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 07/16 11:34 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Gary J Lublin on behalf of Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB. (Lublin, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed
Wed 07/08 3:17 PM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 on Gurvir Hira aka Gurvir S. Hira Filed by Gary J Lublin on behalf of Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB . (Lublin, Gary) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 07/08 2:41 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Gary J Lublin on behalf of Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB. (Lublin, Gary) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 07/08 2:39 PM
[LINK:Summons Issued] Summons Issued on Gurvir Hira . Answer Due 08/7/2015. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (Lublin, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Original
Wed 07/08 2:39 PM
Complaint by American Express Bank, FSB against Gurvir Hira. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)]. (Lublin, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Account Statements | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 07/08 2:42 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint(6:15-ap-00081-KSJ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 46145022, Amount Paid $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |