United States v. Approximately $17,020.00 in U.S. Currency
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01057 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 05, 2016 5:08 AM PST |
Claimant
Raymond Rashaud Cox
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Approximately $17,020.00 in U.S. Currency
|
|
Defendant
Raymond Rashaud Cox
|
|
Plaintiff
United States
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 23 2016
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/16. (Gonzalez, R) |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 02/23 12:01 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/16. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 02/11 3:48 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Final Judgment of Forfeiture by United States.(Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture | ||
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/18 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Amendments to Pleadings: April 15, 2016. Initial Disclosures: Exempt Expert Disclosure: May 31, 2016. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: June 17, 2016. Non-expert Discovery Cutoff: July 21, 2016. Expert Discovery Cutoff: August 26, 2016. Pretrial Motion Filing Deadline: November 1, 2016. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. JURY TRIAL (3 days) set for 4/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minute Order
Tue 11/17 10:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties have filed their consents under Title 28, U.S.C. section 636(c)(1) to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment. Accordingly, the above-entitled action is assigned to Judge BARBARA A. McAULIFFE as Presiding Judge for all purposes. All future pleading shall be numbered 1:15-cv-01057-BAM . signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/17/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/16 3:32 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Raymond Rashaud Cox. Attorney Harris, Justin Dennis added. (Harris, Justin) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 11/12 2:49 PM
MINUTES (Text Only): On November 12, 2015, the Court held a scheduling conference. At the conference, the parties agreed to consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c)(1). Defendant is instructed to file his consent form, which can be found on the Court's website, by November 16, 2015. The Court will issue the scheduling order after the case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Plaintiffs Counsel Jeffrey Spivak - present. Defendants Counsel Miles Harris - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: in chambers, off record. (Herman, H) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order
Fri 11/06 8:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): In light of this case being selected for assignment to a Sacramento District Judge, the November 12, 2015 Initial Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM will proceed as a STATUS CONFERENCE re Consent. At the conference, the Court will discuss procedures in light of the Sacramento designation and will address consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. If Defendant files a consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction prior to the status conference, the Court will select scheduling order dates based on the dates proposed in the parties' joint scheduling report at the status conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Thu 11/05 1:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Attorney Miles Harris, for Claimant Raymond Rashaud Cox, needs to update his business address with the Court. Counsel office address comes up as 7775 N. Palm and his pleading (Doc. 4) has 2115 Kern St. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/5/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report
Thu 11/05 1:29 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by United States. (Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 10/06 12:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the press of business, Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 10/14/2015 to November 12, 2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2015. (Herman, H) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/06 10:23 AM
NOTICE Warrant Returned Executed as to defendant approximately $17,020.00 in U.S. Currency (arrested 7/15/15) by United States. (Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/02 3:40 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by United States. (Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
service
Service by Publication
Fri 10/02 3:38 PM
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION filed by United States. Last publication date 08/13/2015. (Spivak, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Claim - Civil Forfeiture
Fri 09/25 2:50 PM
CLAIM in Civil Forfeiture Case. Claimant(s) Raymond Rashaud Cox added to case.(Harris, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Claim, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Claim, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration in Support of Claim, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration in Support of Claim | ||
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Warrant Issued
Wed 07/15 9:08 AM
WARRANT for Arrest of Articles in Rem Issued. (Flores, E) |
|
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil New Case Documents for Unassigned DJ
Fri 07/10 8:09 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Status Conference re Consent / Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Fahrney, E) |
|
Att: 1 Order Assigning Action to Sac DJ, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $17,020.00 in U.S. Currency by United States. Attorney Spivak, Jeffrey A. added.(Spivak, Jeffrey) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |