Bounkhoun v. Barnes et al
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-06410 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 7:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Steven E Barnes
|
|
Defendant
Ross m Cellino
|
|
Defendant
Cellino & Barnes, P.C.
|
|
Defendant
Christopher D D'Amato
|
|
Defendant
Steven E. Barnes, Esq.
|
|
Defendant
Ross M. Cellino, Esq.
|
|
Defendant
Christopher D. D'Amato, Esq.
|
|
Plaintiff
Chandy Bounkhoun
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification Filed On Wrong Case
Fri 10/16 12:28 PM
E-Filing Notification re3 STIPULATION: Document filed in wrong case. Disregard docket entry. This case, 15-cv-6410, has been terminated and all docketing should be entered on the Buffalo case, 15-cv-631. (LB) |
||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/15 11:29 AM
STIPULATION extending time to answer or otherwise respond to summons and complaint by Steven E. Barnes, Esq., Cellino & Barnes, P.C., Ross M. Cellino, Esq., Christopher D. D'Amato, Esq.. (Briandi, Jody) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 07/15 12:41 PM
Remark: Case initially assigned to incorrect divisional office. Case is assigned to Judge Arcara in the Buffalo office and the new case number is 15-cv-631. All future docketing should be entered on the new case number. (LB) |
||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/14 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT CHANDY BOUNKHOUN against All Defendants, filed by Chandy Bounkhoun.(Burke, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS- SUMMONS | ||
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/13 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT Chandy Bhounkhoun against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2311472.), filed by Cellino & Barnes, P.C., Steven E Barnes, Christopher D D'Amato, Ross m Cellino.(Burke, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |