Turning Leaf Homes LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Coffin |
Case #: | 6:15-cv-01295 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 5:48 AM PST |
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Turning Leaf Homes LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
service
Clerks Notice of Mailing
Mon 10/19 3:19 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Lincoln County Circuit Court regarding Judgment18 . (plb) |
|
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Mon 10/19 3:10 PM
Judgment. Pursuant to the parties stipulation17 , this action is remanded to the Circuit Court for the State of Oregon for the County of Lincoln. (plb) |
|
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
oth_doc
Stipulation
Fri 10/16 10:05 AM
Stipulation to Remand by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Attorney Substitution
Wed 10/14 2:23 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Steve Bonfiglio is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Jeffrey A. Myers Filed by Turning Leaf Homes LLC (Bonfiglio, Stefan) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
minute
Motion Hearing Held
Thu 10/08 10:40 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim8 , Request for Judicial Notice9 . Motion is taken under advisement as of 10/13/2015. Jeffrey Myers present as counsel for plaintiff. Garrett Garfield present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Kristi Anderson. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin presiding. (plb) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Attorney Association
Thu 10/08 9:18 AM
Notice of Association of Attorney David J. Elkanich,Garrett S. Garfield for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Elkanich, David) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
resp
Reply to Motion
Mon 09/21 5:52 PM
Reply In Support to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 8 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
1 - Scheduling
Thu 09/03 9:09 AM
Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim8 , Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim8 9 . Oral Argument is set for 10/8/2015 at 10:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
resp
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/02 2:50 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 8 , Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim8 9 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Myers, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Thu 08/20 9:23 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer6 nunc pro tunc 8/19/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Request for Judicial Notice
Wed 08/19 5:08 PM
Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim8 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K | ||
8 | 8
16
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/19 5:00 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Thu 07/16 1:28 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/13/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/14/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 12/14/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (jkm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition
Thu 07/16 12:23 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund
Wed 07/15 8:22 AM
Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4195315. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Jennifer Kilbourn Related Doc4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
refund
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Mon 07/13 5:04 PM
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal,3 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/13 3:09 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 15CV08466 from Lincoln County Circut. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4195422 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice
Mon 07/13 2:48 PM
Notice of Removal of Nationstar LLC to Plaintiff's Counsel Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Elkanich, David) |
|
1 | 1
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/13 2:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Elkanich, David) |