Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Rob v. ITW Permatex, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:12-bk-19885
Lead BK case is: 2:12-bk-19885
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Eric L Frank |
Case #: | 2:15-ap-00323 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2015 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ITW Permatex, Inc.
10 Columbus Boulevard #5
Hartford, CT 06106 |
|
Plaintiff
Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP One Penn Center, 19th Fl. 1617 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/19/2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/07 11:57 AM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-323 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (J., Randi) |
||
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 12/05 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
court
Hearing Held
Thu 12/03 12:31 PM
Hearing Held on Motion to Approve the Settlement Agreement and mutual release with ITW Global Brands and ITW Permatex Inc.11 . E-Order entered. (J., Randi) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Generic Motion
Wed 12/02 12:47 PM
Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release by and between Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc., Liquidating Trust, and ITW Global Brands and ITW Permatex, Inc. ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. ORDERED that Settlement Agreement as set forth in the Motion and attached as Exhibit "A" to the Motion, is hereby APPROVED. (J., Randi) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 12/02 12:52 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:15-ap-323 settled. (J., Randi) |
||
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of No Response
Tue 11/24 2:07 PM
Certificate of No Response to Motion of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust, for an Order to Approve the Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release with ITW Global Brands and ITW Permatex, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by ANGELA LYNN BAGLANZIS on behalf of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust . (BAGLANZIS, ANGELA) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Motion
Wed 10/28 2:54 PM
Notice of |
|
11 | 11
motion
Generic Motion
Wed 10/28 2:50 PM
Motion (Motion of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust, for an Order to Approve the Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release with ITW Global Brands and ITW Permatex, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019) Filed by Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust Represented by ANGELA LYNN BAGLANZIS (Counsel). (BAGLANZIS, ANGELA) Modified on 10/29/2015 (J., Randi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Service List | ||
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/17 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/16/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation
Mon 09/14 2:21 PM
Order Approving Stipulation re: Stipulation . SO ORDERED subject to the footnote below: No further extensions except for cause shown. Defendant shall have until 10/14/15 to file an answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. (J., Randi) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/11 4:43 PM
Stipulation By Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust and Between Defendant (Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead) . Filed by ANGELA LYNN BAGLANZIS on behalf of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust . (BAGLANZIS, ANGELA) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 09/09 9:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers) by JEFFREY KURTZMAN Filed by JEFFREY KURTZMAN on behalf of ITW Permatex, Inc.. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 08/15 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/14/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Stipulation
Wed 08/12 11:52 AM
Order re: Stipulation Granting Defendant an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise plea Stipulation. Defendant shall have until 9/14/15 to file an answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. (J., Randi) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/11 4:50 PM
Stipulation By Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust and Between Defendant Granting Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead . Filed by ANGELA LYNN BAGLANZIS on behalf of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust. (BAGLANZIS, ANGELA) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 07/16 11:45 AM
Summons Service Executed on ITW Permatex, Inc. 7/16/2015 . (GEORGE, EDMOND) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 07/15 8:55 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) ITW Permatex, Inc. Date Issued 7/15/2015, Answer Due 8/14/2015. (S., Antoinette) |
|
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/14 2:48 PM
Adversary case 15-00323 Complaint by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of Michael H. Kaliner, Liquidating Trustee of the Robert Elgart & Son, Inc. Liquidating Trust against ITW Permatex, Inc.. Fee Amount $0.00 . (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (GEORGE, EDMOND) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |