Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Petrese B Tucker
Case #: 2:15-cv-03942
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2015
Terminated:Jul 18, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2016 7:51 AM EST
Defendant
THE VANGUARD GROUP
Represented By
PAUL G. NOFER
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THOM W. PARSON
Represented By
W. CHARLES SIPIO
Kolman Ely PC
contact info
WAYNE A. ELY
Kolman Ely PC
contact info

GPO Jul 18 2016
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/16. 7/18/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
GPO Jul 18 2016
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 20) IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF ON ALL COUNTS OF THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/16. 7/18/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )

Docket last updated: 12/03/2021 11:59 PM EST
Monday, October 16, 2017
37 37 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 10/17 10:22 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT ENTERED IN FAVOR OF THE VANGUARD GROUP, AND AGAINST THOM W. PARSON, IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,343.67. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/16/17. 10/17/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Costs Taxed Tue 10/17 10:08 AM
Clerk's Taxation of Costs. 10/17/17 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (va, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
35 35 misc Bill of Costs Mon 09/11 4:12 PM
BILL OF COSTS Application of Defendant, The Vanguard Group, Inc., for Taxable Costs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) by THE VANGUARD GROUP. (NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
34 34 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 08/24 3:48 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to33 Notice of Appeal, filed by THOM W. PARSON, that the judgment of the District Court entered July 18, 2016 is AFFIRMED. etc. (va, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Wed 08/17 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re33 Notice of Appeal, filed by THOM W. PARSON. USCA Case Number 16-3410 (dmc, )
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Appeal Fees Thu 08/18 10:42 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number PPE145408 re33 Notice of Appeal, filed by THOM W. PARSON. (va, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 08/16 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to31 Memorandum and/or Opinion,32 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by THOM W. PARSON. No Fiing Fee Paid. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, and Appeals Clerk.(ELY, WAYNE) Modified on 8/16/2016 (tjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, July 18, 2016
32 32 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 07/18 5:41 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC.20 ) IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF ON ALL COUNTS OF THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/16. 7/18/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
31 31 18 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 07/18 5:38 PM
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 7/18/16. 7/18/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2016
30 30 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/20 4:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING29 MOTION TO STAY. CURRENT PRETRIAL DEADLINES. ALL PRETRIAL FILING DEADLINES ARE HEREBY STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TRIAL POOL DATE OF JULY 26, 2016 FOR THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS CANCELLED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/20/16. 6/20/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
29 29 motion Stay Thu 06/16 2:47 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay re17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,12 Scheduling Order,,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement,,,,,22 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, (Consent Motion to Stay Current Pretrial Deadlines Pending Resolution of Summary Judgment) filed by THOM W. PARSON.Certificate of Service.(SIPIO, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 09, 2016
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/09 10:56 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT REPLY filed by THOM W. PARSON. (ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 06/07 9:47 AM
ORDER GRANTING26 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR REPLAY. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE WITHIN 5 DAYS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 6/6/16. 6/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Tue 05/31 4:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by THOM W. PARSON.Certificate of Service.(SIPIO, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 27, 2016
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/27 12:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 16, 2016
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/16 4:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING LETTER REQUEST FOR REPLY TO BE DUE BY 5/27/2016. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 5/16/16. 5/16/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/12 2:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THOM W. PARSON.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1.1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1.2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1.3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7
Monday, April 25, 2016
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 04/25 3:36 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT21 , IT IS ORDERED THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THE 10/16/15 SCHEDULING ORDER12 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: ALL RESPONSES TO ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/12/2016. ALL REPLIES IN OPPOSITION TO ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED BY 5/23/16. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL LIST ON 7/26/2016. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/25/16. 4/25/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/18 11:59 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Extend All Remaining Pretrial Deadlines filed by THOM W. PARSON.Certificate of Service.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 07, 2016
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Thu 04/07 3:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP.Certificate of Service.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 31, 2016
19 19 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 04/01 9:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA Settlement Conference held by telephone on 3/16/16. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/31 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA Settlement Conference BY TELEPHONE held on 3/14/16. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 01/26 4:58 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS15 MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY IS HEREBY EXTENDED BY THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 12, 2016. ALL OTHER DEADLINES AS SPECIFIED IN THIS COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER DATED OCTOBER 16, 2015 ARE SIMILARLY EXTENDED BY THIRTY (30) DAYS. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 1/26/16. 1/26/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2016
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/25 5:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion For An Extension of The Discovery Deadline filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP. (NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/13 1:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by THOM W. PARSON.Memorandum.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 30, 2015
14 14 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/01 10:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA. Settlement Conference held by telephone on 11/13/15. (va, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/20 3:49 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 2, 2016 AT 10:00AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE LINDA K. CARACAPPA, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, IN ROOM 3042, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. COUNSEL ARE FURTHER DIRECTED TO COMPLETE THE ENCLOSED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SUMMARY TO BE FAXED OR MAILED TO CHAMBERS ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 26, 2015. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 11/20/15. 11/20/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
12 12 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Fri 10/16 4:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARACAPPA AT THE END OF DISCOVERY AND BEFORE THE PARTIES FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARACAPPAS CHAMBERS NO LATER THAN SIXTY (60) DAYS PRIOR TO THE CLOSE OF DISCOVERY TO SCHEDULE A DATE AND TIME. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL PROCEED FORTHWITH AND CONTINUE IN SUCH MANNER AS WILL ASSURE THAT ALL REQUESTS FOR, AND RESPONSES TO, DISCOVERY WILL BE NOTICED, SERVED, AND COMPLETED BY WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 13, 2016. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED AT LEAST FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS BEFORE THE TRIAL DATE. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE MONDAY, MARCH 14, 2016. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL LIST ON MONDAY, JUNE 6, 2016. PRETRIAL MEMORANDA: ALL PARTIES SHALL PREPARE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 16.1(C)(1) - (7), INCLUSIVE, AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF - AT LEAST TWENTY (20) DAYS PRIOR TO THE TRIAL DATE. DEFENDANT - AT LEAST TEN (10) DAYS PRIOR TO THE TRIAL DATE. MOTIONS IN LIMINE: ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED AT LEAST FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS BEFORE THE TRIAL DATE. SUCH MOTIONS SHALL DESCRIBE WITH PARTICULARITY THE GROUNDS AND THE AUTHORITY FOR THE OBJECTION. ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 10/16/15. 10/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/16 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/15/2015 10:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER.(adr) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/16/2015) (va, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/15 5:01 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO VOLUNTARILY WITHDRAW HIS DISPARATE IMPACT CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(A)(2) (DOC.9 ) IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS DISPARATE IMPACT CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT THE VANGUARD GROUPS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC.3 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/15/15. 9/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2015
9 9 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/11 12:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, In Part filed by THOM W. PARSON.(SIPIO, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/08 2:27 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 3) BY 9/11/2015. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 9/8/2015.9/8/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/27 2:00 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, In Part filed by THOM W. PARSON.Certificate of Service.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
6 6 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 08/25 11:47 AM
Praecipe to Attach Exhibit A to Defendant's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, In Part by THE VANGUARD GROUP.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 14, 2015
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 08/14 3:56 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE VANGUARD GROUP.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/14 3:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant The Vanguard Group, Inc. by THE VANGUARD GROUP.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant The Vanguard Group, Inc.
3 3 motion Dismiss Fri 08/14 3:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, In Part filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP.Brief, Certificate of Service.(NOFER, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Defendant's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, in Part,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the complaint, in Part, and all accompanying papers
Thursday, July 30, 2015
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/30 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOM W. PARSON re: Richard Scollon Jr. served Summons and Complaint upon THE VANGUARD GROUP by Personal. THE VANGUARD GROUP served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 07/16 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against THE VANGUARD GROUP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-10734342.), filed by THOM W. PARSON.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form
service Summons Issued Fri 07/17 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to THE VANGUARD GROUP. One Forwarded To: Counsel on July 17, 2015 (rt)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 07/17 8:46 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by THOM W. PARSON. (rt)
Related: [-]