Jeffrey Wilens v. NRG Energy Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01128 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2015 |
Re-opened: | May 31, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2016 4:46 AM PST |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
NRG Energy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NRG Residential Solar Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Wilens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
131 | 131
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/02 4:19 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case130 . It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Second Amended Complaint (Docket No. 96) and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to each of plaintiffs individual claims and WITHOUT PREJUDICE with respect to the claims of the putative class described in the Second Amended Complaint; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |