DeiuLio v. Virginia Beach Sheriff's Office et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arenda L Wright Allen |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00312 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 04/21 11:19 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2016. (jmey, ) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 04/21 11:18 AM
DISMISSAL ORDER.17 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of all Defendants. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to update Plaintiff's address in this matter to the address contained within ECF No. 35 in Civil Action No. 2:15cv260 The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Dismissal Order to Plaintiff and counsel for any Defendants who have appeared. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/20/2016. Copies mailed 4/21/2016. (jmey, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 02/24 12:05 PM
NOTICE by Ken Stolle re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (Rosen, Jeff) |
|
19 | 19
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 02/24 12:04 PM
Memorandum in Support re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ken Stolle.(Rosen, Jeff) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Roseboro Notice
Wed 02/24 12:02 PM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion for Summary Judgment by Ken Stolle (Rosen, Jeff) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 02/24 12:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ken Stolle. (Rosen, Jeff) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 02/19 11:07 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Adam DeiuLio re14 . (jmey, ) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 02/10 12:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Ken Stolle waiver sent on 2/4/2016, answer due 4/4/2016.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 02/04 2:05 PM
ORDER. The Defendant is REQUESTED to return the enclosed Wavier of Service within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. If Defendant chooses to return the enclosed Waiver of Service within the thirty-day period, he is ORDERED to file responsive pleadings or appropriate motions to Plaintiff's Complaint as amended within sixty (60) days from the date set forth on the enclosed Notice of Lawsuit. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order and the sample Certificate of Service to Plaintiff, and a copy of this Order, a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, a copy of the amendment to the Complaint, a copy of the Notice of Lawsuit and two copies of the Waiver of Service to Defendant Stolle. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/4/2016. Copies mailed 2/4/2016.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons | ||
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/26 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Wayne Rosen on behalf of Ken Stolle (Rosen, Jeff) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Response Other
Thu 10/22 10:39 AM
Response to10 Order filed by Adam M. DeiuLio.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, October 05, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 10/05 2:17 PM
ORDER. The appropriate officer at the institution at which Plaintiff is incarcerated is DIRECTED to begin submitting monthly installments of twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income to the Clerk each time the balance in Plaintiff's inmate account is greater than $10.00. The Clerk is DIRECTED to establish an account for the receipt of installment payments for action number 2:15cv312 The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and a copy of this Order and a certified copy of Plaintiff's consent form to the inmate account officer at the institution where Plaintiff is currently incarcerated. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/5/2015. Copies mailed 10/5/2015.(jmey, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 10/05 2:06 PM
ORDER.2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee in this action only. The Complaint is ORDERED FILED. The Virginia Beach Sheriff's Office is DISMISSED as a party to this action. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit documentation of administrative exhaustion within thirty days from the date of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/5/2015. Copies mailed 10/5/2015. (jmey, ) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 09/18 12:36 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jmey, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Wed 09/09 2:59 PM
Letter to Inmate Financial Accounts Officer, Virginia Beach Correctional Center. (jmey, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Collection of Fees
Fri 09/04 1:00 PM
Consent to Collection of Fees by Adam M. DeiuLio.(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 08/24 1:35 PM
ORDER.3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED to either sign the enclosed consent to collection of fees form and RETURN IT TO THE COURT or to submit the full filing fee of $350.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint" to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to comply with the procedural requirements outlined in that document. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, a copy of "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint," and the consent to collection of fees form to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/21/2015. Copies mailed 8/24/2015. (jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Consent to Collection of Fees and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 07/30 12:30 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to the Court's interrogatories within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide specific answers to the following interrogatories: 1. How were your constitutional rights violated? Specify the facts upon which you rely to support this allegation. 2. What harm have you suffered from Defendants' actions? Failure to the Court's interrogatories MAY LEAD TO THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION. Upon receipt of Plaintiff's response to the Order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to conditionally file the document as an amendment to Plaintiff's Complaint. Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 7.3015 as DIRECTED. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/29/2015. (epri) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/20 2:34 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Adam M. DeiuLio. (jmey, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/20 2:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam M. DeiuLio. (jmey, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/20 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Ken Stolle, Virginia Beach Sheriff's Office (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Adam M. DeiuLio. (No service copies provided.)(jmey, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |