Variant Holding Company, LLC v. Courtland Gettel, individually and as trustee for
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12021
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12021
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-50931 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JH Greenberg & Associates, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tommy Boy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Variant Royalty Group, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Numeric Holding Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Conix WH Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Variant Management Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Forward Progress Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Premier Home Development Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUI Generis, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Helena, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Conix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathryn Nighswander (formerly Kathryn Gettel)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas O. Wagner, II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Bernstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey H. Greenberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Cash Doye
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Courtland Gettel, individually and as trustee for Walker's Dream Trust, Gettel Children's Trust, Gettel Children's Trust 2 and Gettel Children's Trust 3
|
Represented By
Courtland Gettel, individually and as trustee for Walker's Dream Trust, Gettel Children's Trust, Gettel Children's Trust 2 and Gettel Children's Trust 3
contact info |
Plaintiff
Variant Holding Company, LLC
1200 N. El Dorado Pl. Ste. G-700
Tucson, AZ 85715 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
174 | 174
misc
Affidavit/Declaration of Service
Tue 09/13 4:11 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Complaint Filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC. (Keane, Peter) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 09/13 2:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-50931 Closed (MAS) |
||
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
173 | 173
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Mon 09/12 1:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal // Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Complaint Filed by Variant Holding Company, LLC (Keane, Peter) |