Ian Tamer Kideys

CourtCalifornia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
JudgeLouise Decarl Adler
Case #3:12-bk-00050
FiledJan 04, 2012

Debtor
Ian Tamer Kideys
7160 Encelia Dr
La Jolla, CA 92037-5741
Represented By
Ian Tamer Kideys
contact info

United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Kristin Mihelic
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

last updated: Sunday Feb 10, 2013 10:26 AM PST
Wednesday, January 04, 2012
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 523.00. Chapter 11 Plan due by 5/3/2012, Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2012, Final Installment Due By: 2/3/2012. Filed by Ian Tamer Kideys. (Peterson, J.) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2012 (Peterson, J.).
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Statement of Social Security Number COURT NOTE: The PDF document is a secured image filed by Ian Tamer Kideys. (Peterson, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Application to Pay Chapter 11 Filing Fees in Installments. Fee Amount $ 523.00 filed by Ian Tamer Kideys. (Peterson, J.)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order APPROVING Application to Pay Chapter 11 Filing Fees in Installments Related [+]: IT IS ORDERED that payment shall be made on line by credit card or at the Office of the Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court based on the terms of the application. Until the filing fee is paid in full, the debtor will not make any additional payment or transfer any additional property to an attorney or any other person for services in connection with this case. Entry of an order of discharge or confirmation of a plan will be held in abeyance until filing fees are paid in full or, if not paid, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Barry K. Lander, Clerk signed on Order (Peterson, J.)
Related: [-] 3
5 5 Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor filed by Ian Tamer Kideys. (Peterson, J.)
Related: [-]
8 8 Receipt of Chapter 11 First Installment Filing Fee - $523.00 by JP. Receipt Number 00216882. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 Court Certificate of Mailing re Notice of Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installment with Service by BNC. Related [+] Notice Date 01/06/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Thursday, January 05, 2012
6 6 Notice of Status Conference on Chapter 11 Petition HEARING Scheduled for 2/9/2012 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 2, Room 118, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
7 7 Meeting of Creditors, with Notice of the Court Regarding Debtors Without Attorney Representation. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2012 at 11:00 AM at 402 W. Broadway, Emerald Plaza Building, Suite 660 (B), Hearing Room B, San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch11) Objections for Discharge due by 4/2/2012. (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-]
10 10 Court Certificate of Mailing re Notice Debtor(s) not represented by an Attorney - BNC Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
11 11 Court Certificate of Mailing with Service by BNC. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Status Conference on Chapter 11 Petition
12 12 Court Certificate of Mailing with Service by BNC. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11