New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Marilyn D Go
Case #: 1:15-cv-04325
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2015
Terminated:Sep 30, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 19, 2016 6:46 AM EST
Defendant
AAA Venture Capital, Inc
4360 158th Street
Flushing, NY 11358
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Jeff Liu
4360 158th Street
Flushing, NY 11358
Plaintiff
Chenyong Zhang
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiehui Chen
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Zeng Guang Fu
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Shanliang Hu
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Jingping Jiang
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Wang Liu
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Yongxing Liu
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Yong Lui
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Zan Ni
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Xinle Pan
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Liangguang Sun
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Plaintiff
Jianqing Zheng
Represented By
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Karen Yang
Terminated: 10/08/2015
4360 158th Street
Flushing, NY 11358

GPO Sep 30 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: No error, plain or otherwise, appears on the face of MJ Go's Report and recommendation 20. Therefore, the Court adopts it without de novo review. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with the Report and Recommendation, plus post-judgment interest. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/30/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
GPO Oct 06 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court re-adopts the Report and Recommendation with the following modification: Judgment shall be entered in favor of plaintiffs Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Zengguang Fu, Xinle Pan, Jingping Jiang, Zan Ni, Yongxing Liu, Jianqing Zheng, and Wang Liu against AAA Venture Capital, Inc., and Jeff Liu in the amount of $18,163.62 each, including minimum wages of $2,928.00, overtime wages of $6,153.81, and liquidated damages under the FLSA of $9,081.81 per plaintiff, for a total of $163,472.58. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with the Report and Recommendation, plus post-judgment interest, as modified by this memorandum and order. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/6/2016. (Innelli, Michael)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, October 06, 2016
23 23 3 pgs order Judgment - Clerk Thu 10/06 5:12 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT directing that ORDERED and ADJUDGED that a default judgment is hereby entered against Defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Jeff Liu, jointly and severally, in the amount of $184,725.60 as follows: (a) in favor of Plaintiff Lianguang Sun and against Defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Jeff Liu in the amount of $16,058.02; and (b) in favor of Plaintiffs Shanliang Hu, Xienhui Chen, Zengguang Fu, Xinle Pan, Jingping Liang, Zan Ni, Yongxing Liu, Jianqing Zheng, and Wan Liu and against Defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Jeff Liu, jointly and severally, in the amount of $18,163.62 each, for a total of $163,472.58; and (c) attorneys fees of $4.795.00 and costs of $400.00; and that it is further ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the motions for default judgment as to Yong Lui and Chenyong Zhang are denied; that the Court declines to treat Jinggui Jiang as a Plaintiff in this action; and that no damages be awarded to Yong Lui, Chenyong Zhang, or Jinggui Jiang.. Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk of Court on 10/6/2016. (Fernandez, Erica)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 10/06 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court re-adopts the Report and Recommendation with the following modification: Judgment shall be entered in favor of plaintiffs Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Zengguang Fu, Xinle Pan, Jingping Jiang, Zan Ni, Yongxing Liu, Jianqing Zheng, and Wang Liu against AAA Venture Capital, Inc., and Jeff Liu in the amount of $18,163.62 each, including minimum wages of $2,928.00, overtime wages of $6,153.81, and liquidated damages under the FLSA of $9,081.81 per plaintiff, for a total of $163,472.58. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with the Report and Recommendation, plus post-judgment interest, as modified by this memorandum and order. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/6/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
21 21 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 09/30 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: No error, plain or otherwise, appears on the face of MJ Go's Report and recommendation20 . Therefore, the Court adopts it without de novo review. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with the Report and Recommendation, plus post-judgment interest. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/30/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
20 20 33 pgs motion Report and Recommendations Mon 09/12 9:03 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re13 First MOTION for Default Judgment For the foregoing reasons, I respectfully recommend that the Court award default judgment against AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Mr. Jeff Liu in the total amount of $184.725.60, as more particularly described in this report and recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 9/12/2016. (Moo-Young, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A
Friday, November 13, 2015
19 19 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 11/13 10:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re13 First MOTION for Default Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Spreadsheet
Monday, November 02, 2015
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/03 1:59 PM
Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 11/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go: Appearances by M. Samuel for plaintiffs; J. Liu pro se defendant. Mr. Liu or his attorney should promptly confer with plaintiffs' counsel regarding vacatur of default entered against Mr. Liu and, absent consent, to file an appropriate motion. The parties are encouraged to contact chambers to schedule a settlement conference if they feel it would be useful. Discussion held regarding plaintiffs' inquest submissions. Plaintiffs must supplement their application by 11/15/15 as discussed. FTR/C 10:05-10:30. (Hugh, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2015
18 18 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 10/29 3:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re16 Scheduling Order, by Michael Samuel on behalf of Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 10/29 1:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re13 First MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/26 4:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: upon plaintiffs' counsel's oral request, the telephone conference set for 11/2/2015 will be held at 10:00 AM , as reflected in the attached order to be served on defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/26/2015. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/26 3:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: a telephone conference will be held on 11/2/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go to discuss plaintiffs' damages submissions, including their calculations of hourly rates and the number of hours claimed. The parties should call my chambers at 718-613-2550 at the above scheduled time. Plaintiff is also directed to serve a copy of this order immediately upon the defendants, to send me proof of mailing and, if the mailing is returned, a supplemental affidavit in accordance with Local Civil Rule 55.2(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/26/2015. (Proujansky, Josh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
14 14 misc Letter Fri 10/23 10:19 AM
Letter of transmittal of Motion for Default judgment to Jeff Liu and AAA Venture Capital by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion Fri 10/23 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING: Plaintiff's motion13 for default judgment to MJ GO to hold an inquest or hearing to determine liability and damages and then issue a report and recommendation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/23/2015. Motions referred to Marilyn D. Go. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
13 13 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/22 5:46 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng. Responses due by 11/5/2015 (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 9 pgs Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Judgment,
Att: 4 34 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 56 pgs D,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit E
Thursday, October 08, 2015
12 12 misc Letter Thu 10/08 4:04 PM
Letter by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Parties Thu 10/08 4:41 PM
ELECTRONIC Order Dismissing: Defendant Karen Yang, only. See entry # 12. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/8/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Thu 10/08 5:02 PM
ORDER: The12 request for an extension of time to move for default against defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Jeff Liu is granted and plaintiffs' time to so move is extended to 10/22/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/8/2015. (Moo-Young, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
order Order(Other) Thu 09/17 11:47 AM
ORDER: The docket sheet indicates that the plaintiffs have filed returns of service on defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc. and Jeff Liu and the time for answering has expired. Entry of default against those defendants was filed on 8/25/2015. Plaintiffs must by 10/8/2015, either (1) move for default judgment against those defendants or (2) file a status report. If plaintiffs move for default judgment, they must file the motion and any supporting papers electronically and comply with the requirements of Local Rules 55.1 and 55.2. Plaintiffs must also, by 9/30/2015, provide a status report on how they wish to proceed as to defendant Karen Yang. If plaintiffs have been communicating with defendants and feel a conference would be useful, plaintiffs should promptly call chambers to schedule an initial or settlement conference.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 9/17/2015. (Hugh, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/25 11:27 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that Defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc, Jeff Liu have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of Defendants AAA Venture Capital, Inc, Jeff Liu is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hamilton, Janet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
10 10 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 08/19 4:07 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Jeff Liu,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service AAA,
Att: 3 Affidavit non-military,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
9 9 misc Request for Certificate of Default Tue 08/18 1:11 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Xiehui Chen, Zeng Guang Fu, Shanliang Hu, Jingping Jiang, Wang Liu, Yongxing Liu, Yong Lui, Zan Ni, Xinle Pan, Liangguang Sun, Chenyong Zhang, Jianqing Zheng (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support
Monday, July 27, 2015
8 8 misc Consent to Become Party (Collective Action) Mon 07/27 5:04 PM
CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Chenyong Zhang (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/27 4:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zan Ni, Yong Lui, Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Yongxing Liu, Jingping Jiang, Xinle Pan, Jianqing Zheng, Liangguang Sun, Zeng Guang Fu, Wang Liu. Jeff Liu served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/27 4:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zan Ni, Yong Lui, Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Yongxing Liu, Jingping Jiang, Xinle Pan, Jianqing Zheng, Liangguang Sun, Zeng Guang Fu, Wang Liu. AAA Venture Capital, Inc served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/27 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zan Ni, Yong Lui, Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Yongxing Liu, Jingping Jiang, Xinle Pan, Jianqing Zheng, Liangguang Sun, Zeng Guang Fu, Wang Liu. Karen Yang served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 07/23 4:54 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 07/23 4:53 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/23 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to AAA Venture Capital, Inc, Jeff Liu, Karen Yang. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Liu summons,
Att: 2 Yang summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/23 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7903911 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Zan Ni, Yong Lui, Shanliang Hu, Xiehui Chen, Yongxing Liu, Jingping Jiang, Xinle Pan, Jianqing Zheng, Liangguang Sun, Zeng Guang Fu, Wang Liu. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons AAA,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Liu,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Yang,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/23 4:48 PM
Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]