Rankin-Bey v. Church et al
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Frank D Whitney |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00152 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment
Wed 09/30 11:46 AM
ORDER Waiving the Initial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments to be made from the Prison Account of Napoleon J Rankin-Bey. Directing the correctional facility to transmit monthly payments.. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 9/30/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(lhg) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 09/21 2:39 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) for cases 1:15cv122 1:15cv128 & 1:15cv152 (thh) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Prisoner Trust Account Statement
Tue 08/25 10:37 AM
ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Administrative Remedy Statement IS Requested.. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 8/25/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(lhg) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 07/24 10:03 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/24/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/24 9:42 AM
ORDER granting Pltf's 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, for the limited purpose of this initial review; and dismissing Pltf's 1 Complaint, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Pltf has now reached three strikes under § 1915(g) of the PLRA.) Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/23/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit - 1983 Application IFP
Thu 07/23 3:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Napoleon J. Rankin-Bey.(ejb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/23 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Napoleon J. Rankin-Bey.(ejb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |