Dynamic Digital Depth Research PTY LTD v. LG Electronics Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-05578 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 19, 2016 4:58 AM PST |
Defendant
LG Electronics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LG Electronics USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dynamic Digital Depth Research PTY LTD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
247 | 247
1
pgs
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Fri 12/15 4:15 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal Order | ||
246 | 246
2
pgs
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 12/15 1:35 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case245 . Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
245 | 245
3
pgs
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 12/14 8:29 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Dynamic Digital Depth Research PTY LTD.(Whitehurst, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order |