Nemzer v. Lynch et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01404 |
Nature of Suit | 462 Immigration - Naturalization Application |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 19, 2016 3:46 AM PST |
Defendant
Al Gallman
District 25 USCIS Director 1330 South 16th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85034 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeh Johnson
Citizenship and Immigration Services 424 First Street NW
Washington, DC 20536 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeanne Kent
Las Vegas Field Office Director 5650 W. Badura Ave. #100
Las Vegas, NV 89118 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Loretta E Lynch
950 Pennsylvania Ave.
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leon Rodriguez
Citizenship and Immigration Services 424 First Street NW
Washington, DC 20536 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Daniel Bogden
333 Las Vegas Blvd South #500
Las Vegas,, NV 89101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tal Nemzer
3365 Pepper Lane, Suite 102
Las Vegas,, NV 89120 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago |
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Mon 12/07 10:14 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff Tal Nemzer. The case is Dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 12/07 10:10 AM
ORDER Granting Defendants'9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The case is Dismissed. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 12/07 9:50 AM
ORDER Granting6 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Kathleen A. Connolly to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment for Interested Party and Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Non-Opposition
Thu 12/03 10:46 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction; filed by Plaintiff Tal Nemzer. |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice: Attorney Action Required
Thu 12/03 8:54 AM
NOTICE: of Attorney Action Required re:10 Unopposed Motion: ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Seth L Reszko CORRECTION : Attorney is advised to refile Pleading using the appropriate event Non-Opposition found under the Response, Reply and Other Related Documents category, pursuant to Special Order 109. (no image attached) (RFJ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Unopposed Motion
Thu 12/03 8:29 AM
ERROR: Wrong event selected, by attorney . CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event. FIRST UNOPPOSED MOTION; filed by Plaintiff Tal Nemzer. MODIFIED on 12/3/2015. (RFJ) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 11/16 2:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Al Gallman, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. Responses due by 12/3/2015.(Connolly, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 16, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter
Fri 10/16 11:10 AM
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer / response due 11/16/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter
Thu 10/15 1:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re1 Complaint, by Interested Party Daniel Bogden, Defendants Al Gallman, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. (Rosse, Krystal) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appear
Thu 10/15 9:07 AM
MOTION to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment by Interested Party Daniel Bogden, Defendants Al Gallman, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. Responses due by 11/1/2015. (Rosse, Krystal) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 08/20 12:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tal Nemzer re3 Summons Issued as to USA,1 Complaint,. Al Gallman served on 7/28/2015, answer due 9/26/2015; Jeh Johnson served on 7/30/2015, answer due 9/28/2015; Jeanne Kent served on 7/27/2015, answer due 9/25/2015; Loretta E Lynch served on 7/31/2015, answer due 9/29/2015; Leon Rodriguez served on 7/30/2015, answer due 9/28/2015; Daniel Bogden served on 8/19/2015, answer due 10/18/2015. |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Fri 07/24 7:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 7/24/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 07/23 4:27 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Al Gallman, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Leon Rodriguez, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MMM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 07/23 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Tal Nemzer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/23 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3750257), filed by Tal Nemzer. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/2/2015. Proof of service due by 11/20/2015. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bogden, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Johnson, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Lynch, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Rodriguez, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Gallman, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Kent | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 07/23 4:10 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM) |