SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC. et al v. ADDIT, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anita B Brody |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04107 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 20, 2016 9:39 AM EST |
Defendant
ADDIT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAN-DI-KI LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JANE DOE BUYERS 1 THROUGH 10
Terminated: 09/21/2015
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE OWNERS 1 THROUGH 10
Terminated: 09/21/2015
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Fri 04/29 2:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/29/2016. 4/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/27 5:42 PM
NOTICE by ADDIT, LLC of Settlement (MITCHELL, HEATHER) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/11 5:46 PM
STATUS REPORT Submitted Jointly pursuant to the Court's March 16, 2016 Settlement Conference Order by ADDIT, LLC. (MITCHELL, HEATHER) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/16 2:59 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/29/16 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 3/16/16. 3/16/16 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
29 | 29
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 03/16 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE Telephone Conference held on 3/16/16 (jl, ) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 02/29 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/16/2016 AT 09:15 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THIS CALL AND ONCE ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, TO JOIN CHAMBERS IN THE TELECONFERENCE (CHAMBERS PH: 267-299-7790). (jmg, ) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 02/25 4:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER that ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/6/2016; PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT REPORTS DUE MAY 9, 2016; DEFENDANT'S REPORTS DUE MAY 23, 2015; DEPOSITIONS OF ALL EXPERTS MUST BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 6, 2016 AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 6/20/2016..... SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 2/24/2016. 2/25/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Mon 11/16 3:11 PM
ORDER that BECAUSE PLAINTIFF FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 21) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY (ECF NO. 5) IS DENIED AS MOOT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/16/2015.11/16/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 11/13 4:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY AND INDISPENSABLE PARTIES filed by ADDIT, LLC. (MITCHELL, HEATHER) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/26 4:57 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY AND INDISPENSABLE PARTIES filed by KAN-DI-KI LLC, SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC..(MAGEN, PHILIP) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 10/08 3:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR FAILURE TO JOIN NECESSARY AND INDISPENSABLE PARTIES filed by ADDIT, LLC.Motion to Dismiss.(MITCHELL, HEATHER) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Request for Oral Argument, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Transcript - No PDF
Wed 09/30 10:10 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/1/15 before Judge BRODY. Court Reporter: ESR. HEARING (jl, ) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 09/21 3:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADDIT, LLC, filed by SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC., KAN-DI-KI LLC., JURY DEMAND.(jl, ) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order
Mon 09/21 3:54 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/21/15. 9/21/15 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Wed 09/16 2:29 PM
Memorandum Letter Brief by SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC.. (TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Tue 09/08 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY RULE 16 Conference held on 9/1/15. Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 09/02 4:01 PM
ORDER - AS STATED ON THE RECORD DURING THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 1, 2015, IT IS ORDERED that PLAINTIFFS MUST FILE ITS BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 18, 2015.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/1/2015. 9/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 09/02 2:30 PM
ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF HEATHER L. MITCHELL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/1/2015. 9/2/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 09/01 12:07 PM
ORDER that THE APPLICATION OF DANIEL P. MOYLAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE INTHIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/31/2015. 9/1/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Discovery Plan
Mon 08/31 10:08 AM
Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(MAGEN, PHILIP) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Application/Petition
Fri 08/28 11:23 AM
APPLICATION for admission of DANIEL P. MOYLAN, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT ADDIT, LLC. (Filing fee paid on 8/27/15, #PPE126626) (kw, ) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Application/Petition
Fri 08/28 11:18 AM
APPLICATION for admission of HEATHER L. MITCHELL, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT ADDIT, LLC. (Filing fee paid on 8/27/15, #PPE126626) (kw, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 08/25 2:15 PM
ORDER that THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 14, 2015 AT 11:00 A.M. IS BEING MOVED UP AND NOW RESCHEDULE FOR SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 AT 10:00 A.M.. THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 8/25/2015. 8/25/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 08/24 4:02 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ADDIT, LLC.(KURTIS, MICHAEL) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON OCTOBER 14, 2015 AT 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.8/21/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES SENT VIA ECF.(mo, ) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Memorandum
Mon 08/17 6:00 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by ADDIT, LLC.(KURTIS, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/12 2:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC.. ADDIT, LLC waiver sent on 7/31/2015, answer due 9/29/2015. (TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Mon 07/27 11:18 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including MX USA, LLC with Certificate of Service by KAN-DI-KI LLC, SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC..(MAGEN, PHILIP) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Expedite
Mon 07/27 10:30 AM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by KAN-DI-KI LLC, SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/27 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY R. TWARDOWSKI on behalf of KAN-DI-KI LLC, SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC. (TWARDOWSKI, ANTHONY) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Mon 07/27 9:50 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent DIAGNOSTIC LAB HOLDINGS, LLC for KAN-DI-KI LLC. by KAN-DI-KI LLC.(tj, ) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Mon 07/27 9:49 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent SYMPHY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES, INC. for SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC. by SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC.(tj, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/27 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 124859.), filed by SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC., KAN-DI-KI LLC.(tj, ) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page (Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheets | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/27 9:47 AM
Summons Issued as to ADDIT, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/27/15 (tj, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 07/27 9:48 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAN-DI-KI LLC, SYMPHONY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES NO., 1, INC.. (tj, ) |