Kutzer et al v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel L Hovland |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 23, 2016 9:13 AM CST |
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Kutzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Kutzer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 11/04 1:23 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (1) (certified copy) transferring case to Massachusetts to be included in MDL Docket No. 2657. Case transferred via ECF extract civil case feature.(mk) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 09/11 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Stay filed by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Boschee, Larry) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2015 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 09/03 11:26 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:14 Amended Answer. Clerk's office added link. (lh) |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/01 4:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Angela Kutzer re15 Response to Motion by Angela Kutzer, Bryan Kutzer. (Bakke, Randall) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 09/01 4:48 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Stay filed by Angela Kutzer, Bryan Kutzer. (Bakke, Randall) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/31 8:55 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Jury Demand by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Boschee, Larry) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 08/31 8:26 AM
(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson.(rh) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Reassignment Form
Mon 08/31 8:25 AM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (rh) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Direct Assignment
Fri 08/21 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/4/2015. (lf) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/20 4:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Boschee, Larry) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/20 9:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC.(Boschee, Larry) |
|
8 | 8
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 08/20 9:56 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION to Stay filed by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC.(Boschee, Larry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Schedules of Actions & Notices, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Motion of GSK for Transfer to ED PA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-MDL Notice of Hearing Session, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Schedule of Actions, 4th Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Orders on Motions to Stay | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Thu 08/20 9:50 AM
MOTION to Stay by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (Boschee, Larry) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Reassignment Form
Tue 08/11 8:33 AM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Angela Kutzer and Bryan Kutzer. (mk) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/03 9:20 AM
NOTICE (4th) of Potential Tag-Along Actions by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (jt) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Direct Assignment
Mon 07/27 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bryan Kutzer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/10/2015. (rh) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Direct Assignment
Mon 07/27 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Angela Kutzer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/10/2015. (rh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/27 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. (rh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/27 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 115001191) filed by Bryan Kutzer, Angela Kutzer.(rh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |