Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund v. Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc.
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Joe Billy Mcdade |
Referred: | Jonathan E Hawley |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01313 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 26, 2016 7:38 AM CST |
Defendant
Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Judgment
Wed 04/27 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (JS, ilcd) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 04/22 3:02 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 04/22/2016. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment6 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is AWARDED $1,158.00 in attorneys fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to ENTER default judgment against Defendant. See full written Order.(JS, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
order
Entry of Default
Wed 03/16 9:42 AM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc. (FDT, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
order
Order
Tue 03/15 2:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: The docket in this case reflects that the Defendant's registered agent, Stephen D. Durdel, was served on December 7, 2015. The Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading was due on December 28, 2015. No answer or other responsive pleading has been filed. Because the Defendant has failed to plead or defend, the Clerk is directed to enter the Defendant's default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). The Motion for Entry of Judgment and Order6 remains pending before the District Judge. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/15/2016. (KZ, ilcd) |
||
Friday, February 26, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/26 12:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund re6 MOTION for Default Judgment and Entry of Judgment and Order (Stuckel, David) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 02/26 12:32 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment and Entry of Judgment and Order by Plaintiff Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. Responses due by 3/14/2016(Stuckel, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Cheryl Cottrell, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit David W. Stuckel, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/11 3:02 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: The Court notes an answer was due 12/28/15 and no responsive pleading has been filed. Plaintiff directed to file a Status Report by 2/25/2016. Entered on 2/11/16. (WG, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Thu 12/17 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund. Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc. served on 12/7/2015, answer due 12/28/2015. (Stuckel, David) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Alias Summons Issued
Mon 11/23 4:29 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc. (JS, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund as to Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc.. (Stuckel, David) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/30 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc. (RK, ilcd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/30 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Durdel & Sons Landscaping & Tree Service, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 Receipt 14626023944), filed by Mid Central Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund.(RK, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |