USA v. FATTAH et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:15-cr-00346 |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 18, 2023 12:24 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
BONNIE BOWSER (5)
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT BRAND (3)
Terminated: 12/20/2016
520 CARPENTER LN. APARTMENT 2D
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19119 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHAKA FATTAH, SR. (1)
Terminated: 07/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KAREN NICHOLAS (4)
Terminated: 12/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HERBERT VEDERMAN (2)
Terminated: 09/05/2019
|
Represented By
|
Movant
THIRD PARTY
Terminated: 12/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC
Terminated: 12/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
1. | Pennsylvania Congressman Chaka Fattah Convicted in Racketeering Case (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/22/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 10/04/2017 8:01 AM EDT |